EP0674614 - NOVEL LIQUID PHENOLIC ANTIOXIDANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [1997/23] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Samuel Route des Charbonnières 17 CH-1723 Marly / CH | [1995/40] | Application number, filing date | 94902760.1 | 10.12.1993 | [1995/40] | WO1993EP03502 | Priority number, date | CH19920003905 | 21.12.1992 Original published format: CH 390592 | [1995/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9414748 | Date: | 07.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674614 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0674614 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/732, C07C69/734, C08K5/13 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
C07C69/732 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/134 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/40] | Title | German: | NEUE FLÜSSIGE PHENOL-ANTIOXYDANTIEN | [1995/40] | English: | NOVEL LIQUID PHENOLIC ANTIOXIDANTS | [1995/40] | French: | NOUVEAUX ANTIOXYDANTS PHENOLIQUES LIQUIDES | [1995/40] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.1998 | BE | 06.05.1998 | [1999/27] |
Former [1999/01] | AT | 06.05.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4032562 (DEXTER MARTIN, et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US4477638 (REID WILLIAM J [US])[A] 1-15 |