EP0627051 - CLUTCH MECHANISM, PARTICULARLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1998 [1998/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen 75848 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen F-75848 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIRION DE BRIEL, Jacques 57, boulevard Gambetta F-92700 Colombes / FR | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 94902832.8 | 17.12.1993 | [1994/49] | WO1993FR01266 | Priority number, date | FR19920015246 | 17.12.1992 Original published format: FR 9215246 | [1994/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413970 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627051 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627051 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/58, F16D13/71 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
F16D13/585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1994/49] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSMECHANISMUS INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [1994/49] | English: | CLUTCH MECHANISM, PARTICULARLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLE | [1994/49] | French: | MECANISME D'EMBRAYAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [1994/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 18.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 20.08.1997 | [1998/30] | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2001379 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [A] 4 * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]EP0249469 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,2,3,9 * column 6, line 15 - line 21; figures 16,17 * * column 4, line 12 - line 13 *; | [Y]GB2222439 (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,2,3,9 * figure 3 *; | [A]WO9206312 (DAIKIN MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* figures 1,4 * |