EP0669806 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FORMING A STRAND OF DOUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.H. KAAK Holding B.V. Graaf van Solmsweg 111 NL-5222 BS 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states J.H. KAAK HOLDING B.V. Graaf van Solmsweg 111 NL-5222 BS 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VROUWENVELDER, Cornelis Curinus Graaf van Solmsweg 111 NL-5222 BS 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266 NL-2501 AW The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 94903122.3 | 19.11.1993 | [1995/36] | WO1993NL00244 | Priority number, date | NL19920002023 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: NL 9202023 | [1995/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412037 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0669806 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669806 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A21C7/01, A21C3/02 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
A21C3/02 (EP,US);
A21C7/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1995/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TEIGSTRANGS | [1995/36] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FORMING A STRAND OF DOUGH | [1995/36] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UNE MASSE ALLONGEE DE PATE DE BOULANGERIE | [1995/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3304235 (MECATHERM BAREMBACH [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0478242 (RHEON AUTOMATIC MACHINERY CO [JP]); | [A]US5059440 (HAYASHI TORAHIKO [JP]) |