EP0730774 - THIN FILM MAGNETIC HEADS WITH THIN NICKEL UNDERLAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY, INC. 920 Disc Drive, P.O. Box 66360 Scotts Valley California 95067-0360 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY, INC. 920 Disc Drive, P.O. Box 66360 Scotts Valley, California 95067-0360 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAGEBERG, Frank, E. 6205 Peacedale Avenue Edina, MN 55424 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Mark, S. 5820 Jeff Place Edina, MN 55436 / US | 03 /
ASH, Kenneth, P. 7304 Laredo Drive Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Orchard Kenyon & Co. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | ||
Former [1996/37] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94903341.9 | 23.11.1993 | [1996/37] | WO1993US11571 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514991 | Date: | 01.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730774 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730774 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/31 | [1996/37] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/37] | Title | German: | DÜNNFILMMAGNETKÖPFE MIT DÜNNEN NICKELUNTERLAGEN | [1996/37] | English: | THIN FILM MAGNETIC HEADS WITH THIN NICKEL UNDERLAYERS | [1996/37] | French: | TETES MAGNETIQUES A COUCHE MINCE COMPORTANT DES SOUS-COUCHES MINCES EN NICKEL | [1996/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 08.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.04.1998 | IT | 15.04.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 15.04.1998 | |
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | FR | 11.09.1998 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0387143 (COMMISSARIAT À L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [Y] 1,5,8 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 50 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 8; figures 2C,5 * [A] 9,12; | [A]EP0301823 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP.) [A] 1,5,8,12-14 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 25; figures 1A,2; claim 12 *; | [A]EP0332320 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP.) [A] 1,2,5,8,10,12,13 * column 1, line 28 - line 39 * * column 4, line 4 - line 11; figures 4-6 *; | [A]WO8905505 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP.) [A] 1,5,8,9,11-14 * page 3, line 24 - page 7, line 31; figures 2-6 *; | [A]JPS5933613 ; | [A]DE2833249 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]EP0114076 (HITACHI LTD) [A] * page 7, line 21 - line 25 *; | [A]WO8502706 (KÁRMÁN ET AL.) [A] * page 7, line 27 - line 30 *; | [A]US4103315 (HEMPSTEAD ET AL.) | [YA] - "Laminated Seed Layers for Plated Thin Film Heads and Structures", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, ARMONK, N. Y., US, (199206), vol. 35, no. 1B, pages 457 - 459 [Y] 1,5,8 * the whole document * [A] 2,9,11-14 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840615), vol. 8, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 280)<1566> , & JP59033613 A 19840223 (FUJITSU K. K.) [A] 1,3,5-8,12 * abstract * | [A] - Y. NAGAI ET AL., "Magnetic Anisotropy in Ni/Fe Artificial Lattice Film", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (198808), vol. 64, no. 1, pages 1343 - 1346, XP000020305 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.341857 | Examination | - EP-A- 0 114 076 | - EP-A- 0 301 823 | - EP-A- 0 332 320 | - EP-A- 0 387 143 | - WO-A-85/02706 | - WO-A-89/05505 | - DE-A- 2 833 249 | - US-A- 4 103 315 |