EP0673332 - METHOD OF PRODUCING PREFILLED, STERILE DELIVERY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/39] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS USED IN PRODUCING PREFILLED, STERILE DELIVERY DEVICES | ||
[2002/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT INC. 675 McDonnell Boulevard, P.O.Box 5840 St. Louis Missouri 63134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Mallinckrodt Inc. 675 McDonnell Boulevard, P.O.Box 5840 St. Louis, Missouri 63134 / US | ||
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL, INC. 675 McDonnell Blvd, P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VACCA, Rita, D. 91 Frederick Lane Glendale, MO 63122 / US | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1995/39] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94903555.4 | 09.12.1993 | [1995/39] | WO1993US11980 | Priority number, date | US19920988265 | 14.12.1992 Original published format: US 988265 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413541 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0673332 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673332 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.06.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/02 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
B65B3/003 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3104 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3123 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/1782 (EP,US);
A61M5/31515 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VORGEFÜLLTEN, STERILEN ABGABEVORRICHTUNGEN. | [2002/09] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING PREFILLED, STERILE DELIVERY DEVICES | [2002/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS DE DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE PREREMPLIS ET STERILES | [2002/09] |
Former [1995/39] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VORGEFÜLLTEN, STERILEN ABGABEVORRICHTUNGEN. | ||
Former [1995/39] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS USED IN PRODUCING PREFILLED, STERILE DELIVERY DEVICES | ||
Former [1995/39] | PROCEDE ER APPAREIL DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS DE DIFFUSION DE FLUIDE STERILES PREREMPLIS | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.1995 | Search fee paid | 26.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01204092.9 / EP1188669 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2263865 (LEWIS BAILEN JACOB); | [Y]US3401692 (HARRIS JR RANO JOSEPH); | [Y]US3872864 (ALLEN JR ROBERT E); | [Y]US4718463 (JURGENS JR RAYMOND W [US], et al); | [Y]US4772273 (ALCHAS PAUL G [US]); | [Y]US4838866 (MARSHALL SR WILLIAM M [US]) |