EP0684931 - METHOD FOR DESULFURIZING A GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GASTEC N.V. Wilmersdorf 50 NL-7327 AC Apeldoorn / NL | [1995/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEUS, John, Wilhelm Gezichtslaan 100 NL-3723 GJ Bilthoven / NL | 02 /
VAN YPEREN, Renee Ouderhoek 9 NL-3632 XC Loenen aan de Vecht / NL | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 94904346.7 | 29.12.1993 | [1995/49] | WO1993NL00281 | Priority number, date | NL19920002283 | 29.12.1992 Original published format: NL 9202283 | [1995/49] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9414703 | Date: | 07.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0684931 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684931 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/04, B01D53/52, B01J27/16 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
B01J20/06 (EP);
B01D53/52 (EP);
B01D53/8612 (EP);
B01J27/1853 (EP);
B01J27/19 (EP);
C01B17/04 (EP);
C01B17/508 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/49] | C01B17/04, B01D53/36, B01J27/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1995/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSCHWEFLUNG EINES GASES | [1995/49] | English: | METHOD FOR DESULFURIZING A GAS | [1995/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE DESULFURATION D'UN GAZ | [1995/49] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1994 | Translation filed | 29.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4311683 (HASS ROBERT H, et al) [Y] 1-6,9,11,12,14-16 * column 8, line 13 - line 34 * * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 21 * * example 7 * * claims 1,6 *; | [Y]EP0242920 (VEG GASINSTITUUT NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-6,9,11,12,14-16 * page 12, line 10 - page 13, line 13 * * page 18, line 10 - line 21 * * claims 1,2,6-9,12,14,15 *; | [A]EP0409353 (VEG GASINSTITUUT NV [NL], et al) [A] 2-5,11,12 * page 3, line 29 - line 50 * * page 5, column 10 - column 19 * * page 5, line 47 - line 57 * * example -; claim - *; | [A]US4743574 (MORALES ALFREDO L [VE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,11 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 2 * * example 1; claims 1-3,7 * |