EP0630320 - ADHESIVE FOR BONDING TOGETHER THE SURFACES OF TWO LAYERS OF MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR BY BONDING TOGETHER POINTS ON THE SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TESCH, Günter Avenue Jean-Marie-Musy 15 CH-1700 Fribourg / CH | [1994/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Lesser, Karl-Bolko Dipl.-Ing. Karl-Bolko Lesser Patentanwalt Schuhmarkstrasse 12 1/2 97616 Bad Neustadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Lesser, Karl-Bolko, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt & European Patent Attorney Gnesener Strasse 2 D-85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94904644.5 | 08.01.1994 | [1994/52] | WO1994EP00037 | Priority number, date | DE19934300421 | 09.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4300421 | [1994/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9415782 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0630320 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630320 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/14 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
B32B38/04 (EP);
B32B3/16 (EP);
B32B37/1292 (EP);
B32B37/223 (EP);
B32B7/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1994/52] | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFF ZUR FLÄCHIGEN, INSBESONDERE PUNKTFÖRMIGEN VERBINDUNG VON ZWEI MATERIALSCHICHTEN | [1994/52] | English: | ADHESIVE FOR BONDING TOGETHER THE SURFACES OF TWO LAYERS OF MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR BY BONDING TOGETHER POINTS ON THE SURFACES | [1994/52] | French: | ADHESIF PERMETTANT D'ASSEMBLER LES SURFACES DE DEUX COUCHES DE MATERIAUX, PLUS PARTICULIEREMENT PAR POINTS | [1994/52] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3616150 (BORGE ROBERT) [X] 1,6-10 * column 2, line 44 - line 67 *; | [A]US3654019 (CUSICK GORDON EDWARD) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 28 - line 37 * * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 52; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1466158 (PLATE BONN GMBH) [A] 1,7,13 * page 2, line 94 - page 3, line 62 *; | [A]US4333980 (RUSSELL WILLIAM M) [A] 13,14,16* column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 20; figures 5,6 *; | [DYA]EP0091262 (ADNOVUM AG [CH]) [DY] 2,3,5,15,19,20 * page 7, line 10 - page 11, line 20; claims 1-8 * [DA] 1,4,6-12,17,18; | [XY]US4822663 (REOTT GERALD A [US]) [X] 1,4,6-12,17,18 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 45; figures 1-8 * [Y] 2,3,5,15,19,20 |