EP0673223 - TRANSPORTABLE MODULAR PATIENT MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin New Jersey 08830 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, New Jersey 08830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLY, Clifford M. 60 Snow Road Goffstown, NH 03045 / US | 02 /
HERMANRUD, Bengt 11 Pheasant Lane Topsfield, MA 01983 / US | 03 /
SCHOLZ, Wolfgang 4 Berrywood Lane Beverly, MA 01915 / US | 04 /
BISHOP, Thomas 55 Larch Row Wenham, MA 01984 / US | 05 /
MASCHKE, Michael P.O.Box 398 Danvers, MA 01923-0698 / US | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94904815.1 | 02.12.1993 | [1995/39] | WO1993US11712 | Priority number, date | US19920988989 | 11.12.1992 Original published format: US 988989 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413198 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0673223 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673223 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/0404 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/002 (EP,US);
A61B5/332 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0456 (EP,US);
A61B5/7445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/39] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE MODULAR-AUFGEBAUTE PATIENTEN-ÜBERWACHUNGSEINHEIT | [1995/39] | English: | TRANSPORTABLE MODULAR PATIENT MONITOR | [1995/39] | French: | APPAREIL TRANSPORTABLE MODULAIRE DE SURVEILLANCE DE PATIENT | [1995/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE7145754U (FRITZ HELLIGE & CO., G.M.B.H.) [A] 1,3,13* the whole document *; | [A]FR2145020 (RICHALET JACQUES) [A] 1,7-11,15-21,26 * page 2, line 5 - page 6, line 31 *; | [DX]US4715385 (CUDAHY MICHAEL J [US], et al) [DX] 1-4,9,11,14,17 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 40 * [X] 20,21,26; | [X]WO8900024 (MICROMEDICAL IND PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,17-21,25 * page 3, line 33 - page 6, line 21 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 38 *; | [X]EP0346685 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,22,24 * column 4, line 48 - column 7, line 39 *; | [X]EP0488410 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,11,22-25,12,14 * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 26 * * column 7, line 56 - column 9, line 22 * |