EP0677987 - PLOUGH BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KVERNELAND KLEPP AS N-4344 Kvernaland / NO | [1995/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORGRIMSEN, Tor Stasjonsveien 26A N-4018 Stavanger / NO | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Orr, William McLean URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94905260.9 | 17.01.1994 | [1995/43] | WO1994NO00012 | Priority number, date | NO19930000165 | 18.01.1993 Original published format: NO 930165 | [1995/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9415447 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0677987 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677987 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01B15/00 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
A01B15/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [1995/43] | Title | German: | PFLUGBALKEN | [1995/43] | English: | PLOUGH BEAM | [1995/43] | French: | TIMON DE CHARRUE | [1995/43] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 31.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 03.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Request for further processing for: | 05.08.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1432657 ; | [A]US4333536 (RYAN JOHN W); | [A]US5040616 (HAKE KENNETH A [US]) |