EP0733174 - GEAR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker Hannifin AB P.O. Box 110 52323 Ulricehamm / SE | [1998/14] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states VOAC HYDRAULICS AB P.O. Box 943 S-461 29 Trollhättan / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYDREN, Ingvar Ryttaregatan 8 S-462 40 Vänersborg / SE | [1999/12] |
Former [1996/39] | 01 /
HYDR N, Ingvar Ryttaregatan 8 S-462 40 Vänersborg / SE | Representative(s) | Delmar, John-Ake, et al Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | Delmar, John-Ake, et al P.O. Box 26 133 100 41 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94905277.3 | 06.12.1993 | [1996/39] | WO1993SE01052 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9516151 | Date: | 15.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733174 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733174 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/22, B60K7/00 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
B60K7/0015 (EP);
F16H1/222 (EP);
B60K17/043 (EP);
B60K2007/0061 (EP);
B60L2220/46 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/39] | F16H1/20, B60K17/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/39] | Title | German: | GETRIEBEVORRICHTUNG | [1996/39] | English: | GEAR DEVICE | [1996/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENGRENAGES | [1996/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 20.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 07.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.03.1999 | IT | 24.03.1999 | NL | 24.03.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 24.03.1999 | |
NL | 24.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | NL | 24.03.1999 | |
FR | 20.08.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | NL | 24.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5233886 ; | [A]US4983153 ; | [A]EP0227152 ; | [A]DE2826022 |