EP0680423 - SAFETY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAISER, Hans-Christian Malteserstrasse 13 D-71120 Grafenau / DE | [1995/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAISER, Hans-Christian Malteserstrasse 13 D-71120 Grafenau / DE | 02 /
WÖLM, Holger Kolpingstrasse 23 D-76709 Kronau / DE | 03 /
SCHMITT, Udo Im Felle 19 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Feldkamp, Rainer Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Feldkamp, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Garmischer Strasse 4 D-80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94905663.4 | 20.01.1994 | [1995/45] | WO1994EP00142 | Priority number, date | DE19934301436 | 20.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4301436 | [1995/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9416923 | Date: | 04.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680423 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680423 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/04, B60R25/10 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
B60R25/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | SICHERUNGSSYSTEM | [1995/45] | English: | SAFETY SYSTEM | [1995/45] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECURITE | [1995/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 21.12.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.01.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 11.09.1996 | ES | 11.09.1996 | GR | 11.09.1996 | NL | 11.09.1996 | PT | 11.12.1996 | SE | 11.12.1996 | AT | 20.01.1997 | BE | 31.01.1997 | CH | 31.01.1997 | LI | 31.01.1997 | [2014/22] |
Former [2003/08] | DK | 11.09.1996 | |
ES | 11.09.1996 | ||
GR | 11.09.1996 | ||
NL | 11.09.1996 | ||
PT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
AT | 20.01.1997 | ||
BE | 31.01.1997 | ||
CH | 31.01.1997 | ||
LI | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | DK | 11.09.1996 | |
ES | 11.09.1996 | ||
GR | 11.09.1996 | ||
PT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
AT | 20.01.1997 | ||
BE | 31.01.1997 | ||
CH | 31.01.1997 | ||
LI | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 11.09.1996 | |
GR | 11.09.1996 | ||
PT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
AT | 20.01.1997 | ||
BE | 31.01.1997 | ||
CH | 31.01.1997 | ||
LI | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | DK | 11.09.1996 | |
PT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
AT | 20.01.1997 | ||
BE | 31.01.1997 | ||
CH | 31.01.1997 | ||
LI | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | BE | 11.09.1996 | |
DK | 11.09.1996 | ||
PT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
AT | 20.01.1997 | ||
CH | 31.01.1997 | ||
LI | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 11.09.1996 | |
DK | 11.09.1996 | ||
PT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.01.1997 | ||
LI | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/25] | BE | 11.09.1996 | |
PT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | PT | 11.12.1996 | |
SE | 11.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 11.12.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4380225 (WESEMEYER JURGEN [DE], et al) [A] 11* abstract *; | [A]DE3507593 (GTE GES FUER TECHNOLOGIEENTWIC [DE]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, line 8 - line 24 *; | [Y]EP0225492 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract *; | [Y]DE3545575 (BECKER HANS JOACHIM) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 11 *; | [A]EP0268902 (NEIMAN SA [FR]) [A] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4777468 (EUSTACHE DOMINIQUE [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 7; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]EP0292759 (WILHELM PETER) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * column 1, line 30 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0308988 (SIDELSKY MICHAEL STEWART [ZA], et al) [A] 1,4,7,10 * column 2, line 20 - line 42 * |