EP0730057 - MACHINE FOR PROCESSING TEXTILE SHEETS WITH A LOW-TEMPERATURE PLASMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktsionernoe Obschestvo "Tsvet" ul. Lokomotivnaya, 1 Kostroma, 156603 / RU | [1996/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZELDIN, July Rafailovich ul. Bubnova, 72-96 Ivanovo, 153012 / RU | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 94905881.2 | 03.11.1993 | [1996/36] | WO1993RU00256 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9512703 | Date: | 11.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730057 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 11.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D06C29/00 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
D06B19/00 (EP);
B29C59/14 (EP);
B29K2313/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/36] | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TEXTILBAHNEN MITTELS EINES NIEDERTEMPERATURPLASMAS | [1996/36] | English: | MACHINE FOR PROCESSING TEXTILE SHEETS WITH A LOW-TEMPERATURE PLASMA | [1996/36] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT DE NAPPES TEXTILES AU PLASMA A BASSE TEMPERATURE | [1996/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.1995 | Translation filed | 24.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1996 | Search fee paid | 24.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 24.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/17] | 05.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/17] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.10.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.06.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.1996 | 30.11.1999 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62174236 ; | [A]JPS62172034 ; | [D]SU1536883 (IVANOVSK NI EX K MASHINO [SU]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880122), vol. 12, no. 22, Database accession no. (C - 470), & JP62174236 A 00000000 (TORAY INDUSTRIES INC.) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880116), vol. 12, no. 15, Database accession no. (C - 469), & JP62172034 A 00000000 (TORAY INDUSTRIES INC.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 18, Database accession no. 92-148436, XP002017310 [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]FR2485575 ; | [A]DE3312307 ; | [A]DE4114528 |