EP0682575 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HEATING ASSEMBLY FOR TRANSFERRING LIQUID METAL, HEATING ASSEMBLY, APPLICATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEVA, société dite 43, rue du Pont de Fer F-71100 Chalon-sur-Saône / FR | [1995/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMARTEAU, Jean-Louis 5, rue Olympe de Gouges F-71880 ChATENOY LE ROYAL / FR | 02 /
BOUDOT, Daniel 6, route de Taisey F-71100 Saint-Rémy / FR | 03 /
REMY, Alain 20, rue de la Paix F-71100 Châlon-sur-Saône / FR | 04 /
NYKIEL, Patrice Le Bourg F-71240 Beaumont-sur-Crosne / FR | [1996/05] |
Former [1995/47] | 01 /
COMARTEAU, Jean-Louis 15, rue du Chatelet F-71100 Châlon-sur-Saône / FR | ||
02 /
BOUDOT, Daniel 6, route de Taisey F-71100 Saint-Rémy / FR | |||
03 /
REMY, Alain 20, rue de la Paix F-71100 Châlon-sur-Saône / FR | |||
04 /
NYKIEL, Patrice Le Bourg F-71240 Beaumont-sur-Crosne / FR | Representative(s) | Puit, Thierry, et al Saint-Gobain PAM Service Propriété Industrielle, BP 109 54704 Pont-à-Mousson Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Puit, Thierry, et al PONT-A-MOUSSON S.A. / DDPP, Service Propriété Industrielle, BP 109 F-54704 Pont-à-Mousson Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94906249.1 | 07.02.1994 | [1995/47] | WO1994FR00139 | Priority number, date | FR19930001497 | 08.02.1993 Original published format: FR 9301497 | [1995/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9417938 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682575 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0682575 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/60, B22D35/06, B22D41/52, H05B6/02 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
H05B6/108 (EP,US);
B22D35/06 (EP,US);
B22D41/52 (EP,US);
B22D41/60 (EP,US);
Y10S29/046 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HEIZELEMENTES ZUM TRANSPORT FLÜSSIGEN METALLS, HEIZELEMENT, VERWENDUNG UND ANWENDUNG | [1995/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HEATING ASSEMBLY FOR TRANSFERRING LIQUID METAL, HEATING ASSEMBLY, APPLICATION AND USE THEREOF | [1995/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ORGANE CHAUFFANT DE TRANSFERT DE METAL LIQUIDE, ORGANE CHAUFFANT, SON APPLICATION ET SON UTILISATION | [1995/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 01.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0103220 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]); | [D]FR2532866 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]); | [A]EP0407786 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,5,10,12 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0379647 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2670697 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [A] 1,5,10,12 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3604598 (KAPPMEYER KEITH K, et al) [A] 1,5,10,12 * abstract * |