EP0682646 - GLASS COMPOSITONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PILKINGTON PLC Prescot Road St. Helens Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states PILKINGTON PLC Prescot Road St. Helens, Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FYLES, Kenneth, Melvin 9 Langholm Road Garswood Wigan Lancashire WN4 0SE / GB | 02 /
McPHAIL, Helen, Louise 43 Fairholme Avenue Ashton-in-Makerfield Near Wigan Lancashire WN4 8LL / GB | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Pendlebury, Anthony, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1995/47] | Application number, filing date | 94906262.4 | 25.01.1994 | [1995/47] | WO1994GB00141 | Priority number, date | GB19930002186 | 04.02.1993 Original published format: GB 9302186 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9418135 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682646 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0682646 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C03C4/08, C03C4/02, C03C1/10 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
C03C3/087 (EP,KR);
C03C1/10 (KR);
C03C4/02 (KR);
C03C4/082 (EP,KR);
C03C4/085 (EP,KR);
Y10S501/904 (KR);
Y10S501/905 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/46] |
Former [1995/47] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GLASZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1995/47] | English: | GLASS COMPOSITONS | [1995/47] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE VERRE | [1995/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS57106537 ; | [X]FR2082647 (SAINT GOBAIN) [X] 1-3,5,6,12-15,17-26 * example -; claim 1 *; | [X]GB2162835 (GLAVERBEL) [X] 1,3,9 * abstract *; | JPS61151041 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | JPH035342 [ ] (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [AD]FR2672587 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-26 * abstract *; | [A]EP0507985 (FLACHGLAS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * claim 1 *; | [PA]EP0555552 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,3,4,9* abstract *; | [PX]EP0561337 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,3,4 * claim 1 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910715), vol. 115, no. 2, Database accession no. 14037X, page 331 [X] 1-3,5,6,12-26 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 32, Database accession no. 1982-66836, & JPS57106537 A 19820702 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS KK) [X] 1-3,5,6,12-26 * abstract * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870209), vol. 106, no. 6, Database accession no. 37472, page 288 [X] 1,3-7,10,11,19-21,23-26 * abstract * |