EP0678027 - ANTI-ATHEROSCLEROTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Home Products Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADELMAN, Steven Jay 342 Windy Run Drive Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | 02 /
STEINER, Kurt Edric 15 Woodlane Road Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Connelly, Michael John, et al C/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Connelly, Michael John, et al c/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94906461.2 | 22.12.1993 | [1995/43] | WO1993US12559 | Priority number, date | US19930000777 | 05.01.1993 Original published format: US 777 | US19930157661 | 01.12.1993 Original published format: US 157661 | [1995/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9415612 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678027 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678027 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/56 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/56 (EP);
A61K31/565 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/43] | Title | German: | ANTIATHEROSCLEROTISCHE MITTEL | [1995/43] | English: | ANTI-ATHEROSCLEROTIC AGENTS | [1995/43] | French: | AGENTS ANTIATHEROSCLEREUX | [1995/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 17.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 28.11.2001 | [2002/49] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3507889 (MARSHALL DAVID J) [Y] 1-19 * example 9 *; | [A]US3608075 (GLEN WILLIAM L, et al) [A] 1-31* column W *; | [X]US4154820 (SIMOONS JOHAN R A [US]) [X] 1-8,13-19 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US4379780 (RAO PEMMARAJU N) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * | [DXY] - R. P. HOWARD ET AL., "Evaluation of equilin 3-monosulfate and other estrogens", ARCH. INTERN. MED., (1971), vol. 128, pages 229 - 234 [DX] 1-8,13-19 * table 3 * [Y] 20-31 | [DXY] - M.D. STERN, "Pharmacology of conjugated oestrogens", MATURITAS, (1982), vol. 4, pages 333 - 339 [DX] 1-8,13-19 * tables I,II * [Y] 20-31 | [Y] - F. NUMANO ET AL., "On the mechanism of antiatherosclerotic agents: Microchemical studies on the in vitro effects of pyridinol carbamate and estrogen (premarin) on phosphofructokinase and malate dehydrogenase in the arterial wall", MECH. AGEING DEV., (1973), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 43 - 53 [Y] 20-31 * the whole document * | [Y] - S. RENAUD, "Thrombosis and atherosclerosis prevention by estrogens in hyperlipemic rats", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1970), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 467 - 473 [Y] 20-31 * the whole document * |