EP0636060 - ARTICULATED ARM TRANSFER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROOKS AUTOMATION, INC. 41 Wellman Street Lowell, MA 01851 / US | [1995/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EASTMAN, Richard, H. 36 Mallard Road Needham, MA 02192 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, James, C., Jr. P.O. Box 77 Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Schütz, Peter, et al v. Bezold & Sozien Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Schütz, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94906463.8 | 27.12.1993 | [1995/05] | WO1993US12579 | Priority number, date | US19920997773 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: US 997773 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9414581 | Date: | 07.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636060 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B25J18/04 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
B25J18/00 (EP,US);
B25J17/0241 (EP,US);
B25J9/104 (EP,US);
B25J9/1065 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20329 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20335 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | HANDHABUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT GELENKARM | [1995/05] | English: | ARTICULATED ARM TRANSFER DEVICE | [1995/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT A BRAS ARTICULE | [1995/05] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/47: Teilanmeldung 97115770.6 eingereicht am 10/09/97 | EPB 1997/47: Divisional application 97115770.6 filed on 10/09/97 | EPB 1997/47: Demande divisionnaire 97115770.6 déposée le 10/09/97 | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1994 | Search fee paid | 21.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/21] | 19.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/21] | Divisional application(s) | EP97115770.6 / EP0811468 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4558911 (RUOFF CARL F [US]) [Y] 5-8* column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 12 * | International search | [X]JPH02292153 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]US5151008 (ISHIDA TOSHIMICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5180276 (HENDRICKSON RUTH A [US]) |