EP0683649 - MODULAR HIP PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOWMEDICA INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | For all designated states HOWMEDICA INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCARTHY, Thomas, F. 713 Whitenack Court Neshanic Station, NJ 08853 / US | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Ruddock, Keith Stephen, et al Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | Ruddock, Keith Stephen, et al Pfizer Limited, European Patent Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94906509.8 | 06.01.1994 | [1995/48] | WO1994US00092 | Priority number, date | US19930015119 | 09.02.1993 Original published format: US 15119 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9417757 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683649 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683649 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/36 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
A61F2/367 (EP,US);
A61F2/30734 (EP,US);
A61F2/3609 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/3662 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30331 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30387 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30433 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30736 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/48] | Title | German: | MODULARE HüFTPROTHESE | [1995/48] | English: | MODULAR HIP PROSTHESIS | [1995/48] | French: | PROTHESE DE LA HANCHE MODULAIRE | [1995/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.1998 | BE | 10.06.1998 | CH | 10.06.1998 | ES | 10.06.1998 | GR | 10.06.1998 | LI | 10.06.1998 | NL | 10.06.1998 | DK | 10.09.1998 | SE | 10.09.1998 | LU | 06.01.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
CH | 10.06.1998 | ||
ES | 10.06.1998 | ||
GR | 10.06.1998 | ||
LI | 10.06.1998 | ||
NL | 10.06.1998 | ||
DK | 10.09.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
CH | 10.06.1998 | ||
ES | 10.06.1998 | ||
GR | 10.06.1998 | ||
LI | 10.06.1998 | ||
NL | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
CH | 10.06.1998 | ||
ES | 10.06.1998 | ||
GR | 10.06.1998 | ||
LI | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
CH | 10.06.1998 | ||
GR | 10.06.1998 | ||
LI | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/17] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
CH | 10.06.1998 | ||
LI | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | SE | 10.09.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4608055 (MORREY BERNARD F [US], et al) [A] 3,4,11,13,17 * column A; figure - *; | [YA]EP0201442 (FRANCE IMPLANT [FR]) [Y] 6,15,19 * abstract * [A] 10,22; | [A]EP0366945 (HERMANN AG W [CH]) [A] 4,6,11,17,19 * column 5, line 2 - line 32; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]FR2644690 (MATCO [FR]) [Y] 22 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 2; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0447734 (SULZER AG [CH], et al) [Y] 7,20 * column 2, line 47 - line 49; figure - *; | [Y]WO9203993 (PFIZER HOSPITAL PROD [US]) [Y] 3,8,9,13,14,21 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2668058 (ICP SA [FR]) [Y] 23 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4126837 (AESCULAP); | [XY]WO9219186 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,12,16-18 * page 13, line 2 - line 21; figures 10-13 * [Y] 3,6-9,13-15,19-23 |