EP0681594 - BLOCK COPOLYMER HAVING MIXED MOLECULAR WEIGHT ENDBLOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NESTEGARD, Mark, K. P.O. Box 33427 Sait Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MA, Jingjing P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94906659.1 | 18.01.1994 | [1995/46] | WO1994US00573 | Priority number, date | US19930010122 | 28.01.1993 Original published format: US 10122 | [1995/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9417115 | Date: | 04.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681594 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681594 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08F297/04, C09J153/02, C08G81/02, C09J7/02 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
C09J153/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F297/044 (EP,KR,US);
C08G81/022 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/387 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2809 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2852 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | Blockcopolymer mit Endblöcken verschiedenen Molekulargewichts | [1997/24] | English: | BLOCK COPOLYMER HAVING MIXED MOLECULAR WEIGHT ENDBLOCKS | [1995/46] | French: | COPOLYMERE BLOC PRESENTANT DES BLOCS D'EXTREMITE DE POIDS MOLECULAIRES MIXTES | [1995/46] |
Former [1995/46] | BLOCKCOPOLYMER WELCHER ENDBLOCKEN VERSCHIEDENE MOLEKULARGEWICHT HABEN | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0197774 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-26 * page 7; claim -; table 1 * * page 11, line 1 - line 19 *; | [Y]US4091053 (KITCHEN ALONZO G) [Y] 1-26 * claim 10 * |