EP0685129 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE DYNAMIC MODIFICATION OF CONTROL PARAMETERS IN A TRANSMITTER POWER CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 6455 Lusk Boulevard San Diego California 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 6455 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 10555 Sorrento Valley Road San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PADOVANI, Roberto 12634 Futura Street San Diego, CA 92116 / US | 02 /
ZIV, Noam 10968 Corte Playa Barcelona San Diego, CA 92124 / US | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [1995/49] | O'Sullivan, Gearoid Patrick, et al Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 94907396.9 | 01.02.1994 | [1995/49] | WO1994US01150 | Priority number, date | US19930020482 | 22.02.1993 Original published format: US 20482 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9419876 | Date: | 01.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685129 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685129 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
H04W52/267 (EP,US);
H04L1/0046 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/201 (EP,US);
H04L25/0262 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70705 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DYNAMISCHEN VERANDERUNG DER EINSTELLPARAMETER IN EINEM SENDELEISTUNGSKONTROLLSYSTEM | [1995/49] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE DYNAMIC MODIFICATION OF CONTROL PARAMETERS IN A TRANSMITTER POWER CONTROL SYSTEM | [1995/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE MODIFICATION DYNAMIQUE DES PARAMETRES DE CONTROLE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE D'UN TRANSMETTEUR | [1995/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 10.02.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60130931 ; | [DA]WO9107037 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [DA] 1,14,18 * page 18, line 16 - page 19, line 16; figure 3 * * page 20, line 7 - page 21, line 22; figure 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851119), vol. 9, no. 291, Database accession no. (E - 359)<2014>, & JP60130931 A 00000000 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) [A] 1,7,14,18,22 * abstract * |