EP0641414 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR METERING THE FUEL SUPPLY TO AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/23] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAS, Jürgen Entenäcker 26 D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 02 /
HERTZLER, Siegfried Crayenbuehlstrasse 16 D-67295 Bolanden / DE | 03 /
TJOA, Jan-Tian Alt-Württemberg-Allee 29 D-71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [1995/17] |
Former [1995/10] | 01 /
GRAS, Jürgen Entenäcker 26 D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | ||
02 /
HERTZLER, Siegfried Heutingsheimer Strasse 2 D-70439 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03 /
TJOA, Jan-Tian Alt-Württemberg-Allee 29 D-71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94907495.9 | 19.02.1994 | [1995/10] | WO1994DE00175 | Priority number, date | DE19934308813 | 19.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4308813 | [1995/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9421909 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641414 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641414 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14, F02D41/06 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
F02D41/1488 (EP,US);
F02D41/061 (EP,US);
F02D41/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1995/10] | Title | German: | STEUERSYSTEM FÜR DIE KRAFTSTOFFZUMESSUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [1995/10] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM FOR METERING THE FUEL SUPPLY TO AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1995/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE POUR LE DOSAGE DU CARBURANT DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1995/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4930480 (NOYORI TAKAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 20 - line 45 * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 39 * [Y] 3,5,6,9; | [X]JPS5872628 ; | [Y]FR2311936 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 3,6 * page 2, line 2 - line 25 * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 15 *; | [Y]DE3520050 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * page 3, line 34 - page 6, line 2 *; | [Y]US4437445 (TAKAHASHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * column W *; | [A]US3918257 (HIROSE YUTAKA, et al) [A] 3,4 * column W *; | [A]JPS59196932 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830720), vol. 7, no. 165, Database accession no. (M - 230)<1310> , & JP58072628 A 19830430 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.) [X] 1,2,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850320), vol. 9, no. 63, Database accession no. (M - 365)<1786> , & JP59196932 A 19841108 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) [A] 3 * abstract * |