EP0686003 - COMBINATION GARMENT AND TOTE BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRETSON INTERNATIONAL LTD. Suite 2218, 22/F., Metro Centre II, 21 Lam Hing Street Kowloon Bay Kowloon / HK | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states GRETSON INTERNATIONAL LTD. Suite 2218, 22/F., Metro Centre II, 21 Lam Hing Street Kowloon Bay, Kowloon / HK | ||
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states BOOK, Steven, C. 10220 Scenario Lane Los Angeles, CA 90077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Book, Steven C. 14175 S.W. Hart Road Beaverton, Oregon 97008 / US | [1996/26] |
Former [1995/50] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Maiwald & Partner, Poccistrasse 11 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/51] | Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Maiwald & Partner, Poccistrasse 11 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/50] | Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Maiwald & Partner, Poccistrasse 11 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94907822.4 | 18.01.1994 | [1995/50] | WO1994US00543 | Priority number, date | US19930015556 | 09.02.1993 Original published format: US 15556 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9417682 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686003 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A41D15/04, A45F4/12 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
A41D15/04 (EP,US);
A41D13/0012 (EP,US);
A41D2400/422 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/50] | A41D15/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/50] | Title | German: | ALS TRAGBEUTEL UMWANDELBARE BEKLEIDUNG | [1995/50] | English: | COMBINATION GARMENT AND TOTE BAG | [1995/50] | French: | VETEMENT POUVANT ETRE TRANSFORME EN UN SAC | [1995/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1995 | Search fee paid | 05.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4476587 (ITOI TORU [JP]) [A] 1,25 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 30; figures 1-7 *; | [A]FR2507441 (ANJUBAULT JEAN [FR]) [A] 1,25 * figures 1-3; claims 1-9 * | International search | [A]US2165348 (DAIBER OME C); | [A]US2744253 (FREEDMAN MOLLIE S); | [A]US3412410 (DENFELD TRAUDL M); | [A]US4188988 (AGYAGOS FERENC I [JP]); | [A]US4475251 (HOPKINS PATRICIA A [US]); | [A]US4483469 (ARISLAND BJOERG [CA]); | [A]US4637076 (TARTT EVANGELINE [US], et al); | [A]US4700409 (DE LOTT STUART C [US]); | [A]US5014359 (HANSON JAMES M [US]); | [A]EP0233097 (ACHOUR AIME SAMUEL) |