EP0679190 - METHOD FOR GENERATING SINGLE-STRANDED DNA MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 Harbor Boulevard Fullerton, CA 92834-3100 / US | [2003/19] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Orchid BioSciences, Inc. 303 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Orchid BioSciences, Inc. 101 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | ||
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Orchid Biocomputer, Inc. 303 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | ||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Orchid Biocomputer, Inc. 201 Washington Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | ||
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states MOLECULAR TOOL, INC. Alpha Center, Hopkins Bayview Research Campus, 5210 Eastern Avenue Baltimore, MD 21224 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIKIFOROV, Theo 8 Charles Plaza, Apartment 605 NT Baltimore, MD 21201 / US | 02 /
KNAPP, Michael, R. 2630 North Calvert Baltimore, MD 21218 / US | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Bentham, Andrew, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/48] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1995/44] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94907855.4 | 18.01.1994 | [1995/44] | WO1994US00771 | Priority number, date | US19930005061 | 15.01.1993 Original published format: US 5061 | US19930155746 | 23.11.1993 Original published format: US 155746 | [1995/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9416090 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0679190 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0679190 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/34 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/686 (EP,US);
C12N15/10 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6848 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6853 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6848, C12Q2521/301 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/44] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUM GENERIEREN VON EINZELSTRÄNGIGEN DNA MOLEKÜLEN | [1995/44] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING SINGLE-STRANDED DNA MOLECULES | [1995/44] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES MOLECULES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES MONOCATENAIRES | [1995/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1995 | Search fee paid | 17.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 17.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Request for further processing for: | 17.03.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.1996 | 31.01.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.1997 | 31.01.2002 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2003 | BE | 02.05.2003 | IT | 02.05.2003 | NL | 02.05.2003 | DK | 02.08.2003 | GR | 02.08.2003 | SE | 02.08.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | ES | 13.08.2003 | LU | 18.01.2004 | IE | 19.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2013/50] |
Former [2008/05] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
BE | 02.05.2003 | ||
IT | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
LU | 18.01.2004 | ||
IE | 19.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
BE | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
LU | 18.01.2004 | ||
IE | 19.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
BE | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
IE | 19.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
BE | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
BE | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 02.05.2003 | |
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 02.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4521509 (BENKOVIC STEPHEN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4656127 (MUNDY CHRISTOPHER R [GB]) [Y] 12-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO8911548 (CETUS CORP [US]) [Y] 15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0412883 (BERTIN & CIE [FR]) [Y] 12-14 * the whole document *; | [Y] - HIGUCHI R G ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF SINGLE-STRANDED DNA TEMPLATES BY EXONUCLEASE DIGESTION FOLLOWING THE POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19891011), vol. 17, no. 19, page 5865, XP000226748 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * | [PY] - NEWTON ET AL., "THE PRODUCTION OF PCR PRODUCTS WITH 5' SINGLE-STRANDED TAILS USING PRIMERS THAT INCORPORATE NOVEL PHOSPHORAMIDITE INTERMEDIATES", NUCL. ACIDS RES., (199304), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 1155 - 1162, XP002060902 [PY] 1-19 * the whole document * | [T] - NIKIFOROV ET AL., "THE USE OF PHOSPHOROTHIOATE PRIMERS AND EXONUCLEASE HYDROLYSIS FOR THE PREPARATION OF SINGLE-STRANDED PCR PRODUCTS AND THEIR DETECTION BY SOLID-PHASE HYBRIDIZATION", PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS, (1994), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 285 - 291, XP002060903 [T] 1-19 * the whole document * | [T] - NIKIFOROV T T ET AL, "GENETIC BIT ANALYSIS: A SOLID PHASE METHOD FOR TYPING SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHISMS", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (199410), vol. 22, no. 20, pages 4167 - 4175, XP002015765 [T] 12-19 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4683194 (SAIKI RANDALL K [US], et al); | [Y]US4683195 (MULLIS KARY B [US], et al) | [Y] - Nucleic Acids Research, Symposium Series No. 18, issued 1987, GISH and ECKSTEIN, "DNA and RNA Sequencing Utilizing Phosphorothioate Chemistry", pages 253-256, see entire document. | [Y] - DNA, Volume 5, No. 2, issued 1986, LABEIT et al., "Laboratory Methods: A New Method of DNA Sequencing Using Deoxynucleoside Alpha-Thiotriphosphates", pages 173-177, see entire document. | [A] - Bioconjugate Chemistry, Volume 1, Number 3, issued May/June 1990, GOODCHILD, "Conjugates of Oligonucleotides and Modified Oligonucleotides: A Review of their Synthesis and Properties", pages 165-187, see entire document. | [A] - Biochemistry, Volume 15, No. 8, issued 1976, ECKSTEIN and GOODY, "Synthesis and Properties of Diateriosomers of Adenosine 5'(O-1-Thiotriphosphate) and Adenosine 5'-(O-2-Thiotriphosophate)", pages 1685-1691, see entire document. | [A] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, United States of America, Volume 78, Number 12, issued 1981, PUTNEY et al., "A DNA Fragment with an Alpha-Phosphorothioate Nucleotide at One End is Asymmetrically Blocked from Digesion by Exonuclease III and Can Be Replicated In Vivo", pages 7350-7354, see entire | [A] - Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, Volume 179, Number 3, issued 30 September 1991, KIM et al., "Phosphorothioate Analogues of Oligodeoxyribonucleotide: Synthesis and Activity as Inhibitors of Replication of Human Immunodeficiency Virus", pages 1614-1619, see entire document. | [A] - Journal of Organic Chemistry, Volume 54, issued 1989, LUDWIG et al., "Rapid and Efficient Synthesis of Nucleoside 5'-O-(1-Thiotriphosphates),5'-Triphosphates and 2'3'-Cyclophosphorotioates Using 2-Chloro-4H-1,3,2-Benzodioxyphosphorin-4- one", pages 631-635, see entire document. | [Y] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 13, Number 24, issued 1985, TAYLOR et al., "The Rapid Generation of Oligonucleotide-Directed Mutations at High Frequency Using Phosphorothioate-Modified DNA", pages 8765-8785, see entire document. | [A] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 16, Number 3, issued 1988, SAYERS et al., "5'-3' Exonucleases in Phosphorothioatebased Oligonucleotide-Directed Mutagenesis", pages 791-802, see entire document. | [Y] - Biochemistry, Volume 26, issued 1987, OTT et al., "Protection of Oligonucleotide Primers against Degradation by DNA Polymerase I", pages 8237-8241, see pages 8237, 8239-8241. | [A] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 14, Number 24, issued 1986, NAKAMAYE et al., "Inhibition of Restriction Endonuclease Nci I Cleavage by Phosphorothioate Groups and its Application of Oligonucleotide-Directed Mutagenesis", pages 9679-9698, see entire document. |