EP0681725 - IMAGE COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1998 | Change - date of supplementary search report | published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WOLFE, Edward A. 69 Tel-Hai Street Kfar Saba / IL | For all designated states BARON, Ehud 61 Haag Street Haifa 34 980 / IL | [1995/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARON, Ehud 61 Haag Street 34980 Haifa / IL | 02 /
PRISHVIN, Alexander 82 Hantke Street Jerusalem / IL | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94907930.5 | 31.01.1994 | [1995/46] | WO1994US01095 | Priority number, date | IL19930104575 | 01.02.1993 Original published format: IL 10457593 | [1995/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9418663 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681725 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/02, G08C21/00, G06K11/18 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06V30/333 (EP);
G07C9/35 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/46] | G09G3/02, G08C21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | BILDKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [1995/46] | English: | IMAGE COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [1995/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION PAR IMAGE | [1995/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1995 | Search fee paid | 25.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 30.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/50] | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0098117 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8-20,24,26-29 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 35 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 14 *; | [X]US4654648 (HERRINGTON RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13-29 * column 4, line 7 - line 68 * * column 11, line 52 - line 57 *; | [X]US4814552 (STEFIK MARK J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9,13-29 * column 2, line 30 - line 68 * * column 4, line 52 - line 55 *; | [X]EP0507269 (YASHIMA DENKI KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11,12,14-20,24,26-29 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 56 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 11 *; | [E]WO9409447 (ORBACH ZVI [US], et al) [E] 1-29* column W * | International search | [X]US4468694 (EDGAR ALBERT D [US]); | [XY]US4806707 (LANDMEIER WALDO L [US]); | [XY]US4856077 (ROTHFJELL ERIC [SE]); | [Y]US4988981 (ZIMMERMAN THOMAS G [US], et al); | [X]US5025314 (TANG JOHN C [US], et al); | [XY]US5164585 (LIEU YIN S [TW]); | [XP]US5227622 (SUZUKI TORU [JP]) |