EP0655913 - NOVEL METALLOCENES AS ANTI-TUMOR DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEINAN, Ehud 6549 Dennison Avenue San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [1995/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94908077.4 | 19.08.1993 | [1995/23] | WO1993US07875 | Priority number, date | IL19920102866 | 19.08.1992 Original published format: IL 10286692 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404142 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655913 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/28, C07F17/00, C07F7/28 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/23] | Title | German: | NEUE METALLOCENE ALS ANTITUMORARZNEIMITTEL | [1995/23] | English: | NOVEL METALLOCENES AS ANTI-TUMOR DRUGS | [1995/23] | French: | NOUVEAUX METALLOCENES UTILISES COMME MEDICAMENTS ANTITUMORAUX | [1995/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1995 | Search fee paid | 14.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 20.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/38] | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KÖPF-MAIER, P., "Tumorhemmende Cyclopentadienylmetall-Komplexe: experimentelle Untersuchungen zur Uberprüfung der Cyclopentadie-Hypothese", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 342, pages 167 - 176 [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5002969 (KOEPF-MAIER PETRA [DE], et al) | [X] - Journal of Organometallic Chemistry, Volume 11, No. 3, issued March 1968, K. ANDRA, "Dicyclopentadienyltitandiphenoxide", pages 567-570, see page 567, especially table I, compound (II). | [Y] - R. FELD et al., "The Organic Chemistry of Titanium", published 1965 by Butterworths Inc. (Washington, D.C.), see pages 3-15, especially page 5, reaction equation No. 1.13. | [A] - P.C. WAILES et al., "Organometallic Chemistry of Titanium, Zirconium, and Hafnium", published 1974 by Academic Press (N.Y.), see pages 62-73. |