EP0685086 - DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY GENERATING A KNOWLEDGEBASE FOR AN EXPERT DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 80 02 30 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 80 02 30 D-70546 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER-GRAMANN, Klaus, Dieter Olbersstrasse 4 D-10589 Berlin / DE | 02 /
JÜNGST, Ernst-Werner Müllerstrasse 55 A D-13349 Berlin / DE | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Erbacher, Alfons EHG Elektroholding GmbH Patente Bockenheimer Landstrasse 101 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [1995/49] | Erbacher, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing. AEG Aktiengesellschaft Patent- und Lizenzwesen D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 94908303.4 | 14.02.1994 | [1995/49] | WO1994EP00420 | Priority number, date | DE19934305522 | 17.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4305522 | [1995/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9419739 | Date: | 01.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685086 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685086 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F11/22 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
G06F11/2257 (EP,US);
G06N5/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/49] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN ERZEUGUNG EINER WISSENSBASIS FÜR EIN DIAGNOSE-EXPERTENSYSTEM | [1995/49] | English: | DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY GENERATING A KNOWLEDGEBASE FOR AN EXPERT DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM | [1995/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE AUTOMATIQUEMENT UNE BASE DE CONNAISSANCES POUR UN SYSTEM EXPERT DE DIAGNOSTIC | [1995/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 23.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4766595 (GOLLOMP BERNARD P [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 45 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0352514 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0469756 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract ** claims 1,4-6 * |