EP0684974 - APPARATUS FOR APPLYING A COATING MATERIAL TO SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/49] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING A COATING MATERIAL TO SHEETS | ||
[1998/15] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.12.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RITTER, Johannes A. Frankensteiner Strasse 44 D-64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94908304.2 | 15.02.1994 | [1995/49] | WO1994EP00421 | Priority number, date | DE19934305081 | 19.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4305081 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9419419 | Date: | 01.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0684974 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684974 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
B05D1/286 (EP,US);
B05C1/003 (EP,US);
B05C1/025 (EP,US);
B05C1/027 (EP,US);
B05C1/0826 (EP,US);
B05C1/14 (EP,US);
B05C1/16 (EP,US);
B05C9/14 (EP,US);
B05D5/10 (EP,US);
B05C9/04 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1705 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1768 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1798 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Beschichtung von Blättern | [1998/15] | English: | APPARATUS FOR APPLYING A COATING MATERIAL TO SHEETS | [1998/15] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER UNE MATIERE DE REVETEMENT SUR DES FEUILLES | [1998/15] |
Former [1995/49] | Verfahren und Gerät zur Beschichtung von Folien | ||
Former [1995/49] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING A COATING MATERIAL TO SHEETS | ||
Former [1995/49] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER UNE MATIERE DE REVETEMENT SUR DES FLUIDES | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/35: Teilanmeldung 97109568.2 eingereicht am 12/06/97 | EPB 1997/35: Divisional application 97109568.2 filed on 12/06/97 | EPB 1997/35: Demande divisionnaire 97109568.2 déposée le 12/06/97 | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97109568.2 / EP0802250 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.1999
22.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE Print Inform GmbH & Co KG Borsigstrasse 8 D-24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al, et al Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.1999
22.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE Print Inform GmbH & Co KG Borsigstrasse 8 D-24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner, et al, et al Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | 11.02.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.08.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.09.2000 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.09.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2001/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 21.06.1999 | AT | 15.02.2000 | DK | 15.02.2000 | IE | 15.02.2000 | LU | 15.02.2000 | ES | 16.02.2000 | SE | 16.02.2000 | BE | 28.02.2000 | CH | 29.02.2000 | GR | 29.02.2000 | LI | 29.02.2000 | PT | 31.08.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/37] | MC | 21.06.1999 | |
AT | 15.02.2000 | ||
DK | 15.02.2000 | ||
IE | 15.02.2000 | ||
ES | 16.02.2000 | ||
SE | 16.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
GR | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2004/09] | MC | 21.06.1999 | |
AT | 15.02.2000 | ||
DK | 15.02.2000 | ||
IE | 15.02.2000 | ||
SE | 16.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
GR | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | MC | 21.06.1999 | |
AT | 15.02.2000 | ||
DK | 15.02.2000 | ||
IE | 15.02.2000 | ||
SE | 16.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | MC | 21.06.1999 | |
AT | 15.02.2000 | ||
IE | 15.02.2000 | ||
SE | 16.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 15.02.2000 | |
IE | 15.02.2000 | ||
SE | 16.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
CH | 29.02.2000 | ||
LI | 29.02.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 15.02.2000 | |
IE | 15.02.2000 | ||
SE | 16.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 15.02.2000 | |
IE | 15.02.2000 | ||
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 15.02.2000 | |
BE | 28.02.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 15.02.2000 | |
BE | 28.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2166717 (RODWELL HTB LIMITED) [A] 1* figures 1,2; claim - *; | [A]DE3606199 (PAGENDARM ERICH) [A] 1 * page 2, line 26 - page 5, line 55; claim - * |