EP0687270 - OSTEOGENIC GROWTH OLIGOPEPTIDES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM 46 Jabotinsky Street Jerusalem 91 999 / IL | [1999/03] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states YISSUM RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM 46 Jabotinsky Street Jerusalem 91 999 / IL | ||
For all designated states GOLDIN, Douglas Michael 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAB, Itai 26 Hateena Street Carmei Joseph, M.P. Ayalon / IL | 02 /
MUHLRAD, Andras 29/A Neve Shaanan Street Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
CHOREV, Michael 135/4 Feinstein Street Jerusalem / IL | 04 /
SHTEYER, Arie 37 Ha'arazim Street Mevasseret Zion / IL | 05 /
GREENBERG, Zvi 19 Joshua Ben-Nun Street Givat Zeev / IL | 06 /
MANSUR, Nura 3/24 Giborei Israel Street 72462 Ramla / IL | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94908419.8 | 04.03.1994 | [1995/51] | WO1994GB00416 | Priority number, date | IL19930104954 | 04.03.1993 Original published format: IL 10495493 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420529 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687270 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687270 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/10, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, A61K38/00 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
C07K14/51 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/51] | C07K5/10, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/51] | Title | German: | OSTEOGENE WACHSTUMS-OLIGOPEPTIDE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1995/51] | English: | OSTEOGENIC GROWTH OLIGOPEPTIDES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM | [1995/51] | French: | OLIGOPEPTIDES DE CROISSANCE OSTEOGENE ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [1995/51] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.01.2000 | Decision despatched | 17.07.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 03.08.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0384731 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [DX] 1,2,6,7,14,15,17-23 * page 3, line 18 - line 26; example 4; claim -; table A *; | [PX]EP0572122 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL]) [PX] 1,6,7,10,14,15,17-23* example -; claim - * | [Y] - I. BAB ET AL., "Histone H4-related osteogenic growth peptide (OGP): a novel circulating stimulator of osteoblastic activity", EMBO JOURNAL, EYNSHAM, OXFORD GB, (199205), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 1867 - 1873 [Y] 1,2,6,7,14,15,17-23 * page 1869, column L, paragraph 2 - page 1870, column L, paragraph 1; table I * * page 1871, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 1872, column L, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * | [Y] - E.P. KHARCHENKO ET AL., "Highly active analogs of apiate-like peptides historphin and kapporphine", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890522), vol. 110, no. 21, Database accession no. 186143, page 96, column L [Y] 1,2,6,7,14,15,17-23 * abstract * | [D] - VOPR. MED. KHIM., (1989), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 106 - 109 | [PX] - Z. GREENBERG ET AL., "Mitogenic action of osteogenic growth peptide (OGP): role of amino and carboxy-terminal regions in charge", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (19931013), vol. 1178, no. 3, pages 273 - 280 [PX] 1 * see Discussion on pages 279-280 * | [A] - 'Preparation and Bioassay of Bone Morphogenic Protein and Polypeptide Fragments', by M.R. Urist et al., in Methods in Enzymology Vol. 146 [A] 1 * ed. by. D. Barnes and D.A. Sirbasku, pub. Academic Press, 1987 * * pages 294-312 * * page 302, paragraph 3 * |