EP0683841 - LINED MANHOLE ASSEMBLY AND LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRICKLAND INDUSTRIES, INC. 233-2 Tresca Road Jacksonville Florida 32225 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | For all designated states STRICKLAND INDUSTRIES, INC. 233-2 Tresca Road Jacksonville, Florida 32225 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRICKLAND, James, K. 4251 Monument Road, 501 Jacksonville, FL 32225 / US | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers, 4, Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1995/48] | Adkins, Michael Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn GB-LONDON EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94908693.8 | 10.02.1994 | [1995/48] | WO1994US01200 | Priority number, date | US19930015166 | 11.02.1993 Original published format: US 15166 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9418418 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683841 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/06, E02D29/14, B28B19/00, E03F5/02, E02D29/12, B28B7/16, B28B7/04, B28B7/30 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
B28B19/0038 (EP,US);
B28B19/0046 (EP,US);
B28B7/04 (EP,US);
B28B7/168 (EP,US);
B28B7/30 (EP,US);
E02D29/12 (EP,US);
E02D29/124 (EP,US);
E02D29/125 (EP,US);
E02D31/06 (EP,US);
E03F5/02 (EP,US);
E03F5/021 (EP,US);
E03F5/024 (EP,US);
E03F5/025 (EP,US);
F16L58/1009 (EP,US);
Y10S220/917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24702 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/48] | E04G11/06, E02D29/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/48] | Title | German: | AUSGEKLEIDETES MANNLOCH UND AUSKLEIDUNG | [1995/48] | English: | LINED MANHOLE ASSEMBLY AND LINER | [1995/48] | French: | ENSEMBLE TROU D'HOMME REVETU ET REVETEMENT | [1995/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1995 | Search fee paid | 07.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 08.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/50] | 12.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]DE2952540 (DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,5-7,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 17,18,20,21,23,24; | [AY]DE2855201 (BUECKER BERNHARD) [A] 1,6,9,15 * the whole document * [Y] 17,18,20,21,23,24; | [AY]GB1392436 (HOWARD K R) [A] 1,2,4-6,9,11,14 * page 2, line 122 - page 3, line 23; figures 4-6 * [Y] 24; | [AP]GB2264719 (WELDING INST [GB]) [AP] 1,6,9,14 * page 10, line 27 - page 10, line 29 * * page 14, line 14 - page 14, line 23 * * figures 7-10 *; | [A]EP0225202 (TUYAUX BONNA [FR]) [A] 1,6,9 * figures 4A-4I *; | [T]US5386669 (ALMEIDA ANTONIO V [US]) [T] 1,8-11,15,17-20,24 * column 9, line 61 - column 10, line 11 * * figures 4-6,34 * | International search | [X]US4828902 (WELYGAN DENNIS G [US], et al); | [Y]US3533896 (HARTIG MARTVAL J); | [Y]US1050137 (HORNER SCOTT [US]); | [Y]US3340126 (KNIGHT ALAN C) |