EP0662175 - BITUMASTIC SIMULATED PAVED SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2000 | Change - oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRISMO LIMITED Gleneagles Court, Brighton Road Crawley West Sussex RH10 6UE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states PRISMO LIMITED Gleneagles Court, Brighton Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 6UE / GB | ||
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states ROADTEX LIMITED Bellbrook Estate Uckfield, East Sussex TN22 1QL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCINTOSH, James 23 Keld Drive Uckfield, East Sussex TN22 5BS / GB | 02 /
LUCAS, Graham, John 38 Ferriers Way Uckfield, East Sussex TN22 5BY / GB | [1996/50] |
Former [1995/28] | 01 /
MCINTOSH, James 23 Keld Drive Uckfield, East Sussex TN22 5BS / GB | ||
02 /
LUCAS, Graham John 38 Ferriers Way Uckfield, East Sussex TN22 5BY / GB | Representative(s) | Abrams, Michael John, et al Haseltine Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Abrams, Michael John, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | ||
Former [1995/28] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94908861.1 | 27.08.1993 | [1995/28] | WO1993GB01832 | Priority number, date | GB19920019105 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: GB 9219105 | GB19920019106 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: GB 9219106 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405861 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662175 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662175 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/43, E01C7/35, E01F9/04 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
E01C19/43 (EP,US);
E01C7/356 (EP,US);
E01F9/529 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/01] |
Former [1995/28] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BITUMINÖSE SIMULIERTE PFLASTEROBERFLÄCHE | [1996/50] | English: | BITUMASTIC SIMULATED PAVED SURFACE | [1995/28] | French: | SURFACE PAVEE ARTIFICIELLE EN BITUMASTIC | [1995/28] |
Former [1995/28] | BITUMINÖSE SIMULIERTE PFLASTER OBERFLÄCHE | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 11.12.1996 | GR | 11.12.1996 | PT | 11.03.1997 | SE | 11.03.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 11.12.1996 | |
PT | 11.03.1997 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | PT | 11.03.1997 | |
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | PT | 11.03.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE7716116U (SCHEMEL) [A] 10,38* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0034296 (DUNLOP LTD [GB]) [A] 6-8,27,28 * page 5, line 7 - line 30 *; | [Y]US5033906 (JORDAN BRADLEY L [US]) [Y] 1,5,9,24,25 * column W *; | [YA]EP0483995 (FIBRESCREED LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,5,9,24,25 * the whole document * [A] 11-22,29,37,38 |