EP0686120 - METAL CONTAINER CAPABLE OF WITHSTANDING INTERNAL OVER PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schäfer Werke GmbH Pfannenbergstrasse 1 D-57290 Neunkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states SCHÄFER WERKE GmbH Pfannenbergstrasse 1 D-57290 Neunkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHREPFER, Bernd Schillerstrasse 6 D-57567 Daaden / DE | 02 /
REICHMANN, Hans-Helmut Kolpingstrasse 3 D-57299 Burbach / DE | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerd, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Müller, Gerd, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94909025.2 | 23.02.1994 | [1995/50] | WO1994EP00510 | Priority number, date | DE19930003113U | 05.03.1993 Original published format: DE 9303113 U | [1995/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420375 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686120 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686120 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/00, F17C13/12 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
B65D77/225 (EP,US);
B65D25/34 (EP,US);
B65D7/42 (EP,US);
Y10S220/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1995/50] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER AUS METALL, DER DURCH INNEREN ÜBERDRUCK BELASTBAR IST | [1995/50] | English: | METAL CONTAINER CAPABLE OF WITHSTANDING INTERNAL OVER PRESSURE | [1995/50] | French: | RECIPIENT EN METAL POUVANT SUPPORTER UNE SURPRESSION INTERNE | [1995/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.1997
29.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE Thielmann AG Kommanditgesellschaft Sechsheldener Str. 122 D-35708 Haiger / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.1997
29.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE Thielmann AG Kommanditgesellschaft Sechsheldener Str. 122 D-35708 Haiger / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1997/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.1997
Thielmann AG Kommanditgesellschaft Sechsheldener Str. 122 D-35708 Haiger / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | 20.10.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.05.1998 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1998 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 29.06.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.07.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.02.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/16] | Appeal following opposition | 21.09.1999 | Appeal received No. T0937/99 | 30.11.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.02.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2336889 (HOELL METALLWARENFAB KARL [AT]) [A] 1* figure 15 *; | [DA]DE3533406 (SCHAEFER WERKE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3737977 (HOESCH AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |