EP0688288 - TWICE USABLE ENVELOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Preuss, Rüdiger Deichstrasse 4 21217 Seevetal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states Preuss, Rüdiger Deichstrasse 4 D-21217 Seevetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Bogatzky, Jürgen Lüneburger Tor 4 21073 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Schmidt-Bogatzky, Jürgen, Dr. Ing. Warburgstrasse 50 D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94909112.8 | 04.03.1994 | [1995/52] | WO1994EP00641 | Priority number, date | DE19930003776U | 15.03.1993 Original published format: DE 9303776 U | DE19930016346U | 26.10.1993 Original published format: DE 9316346 U | [1995/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9421523 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688288 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688288 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D27/06 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
B65D27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | ZWEIWEG-UMSCHLAG | [1995/52] | English: | TWICE USABLE ENVELOPE | [1995/52] | French: | ENVELOPPE UTILISABLE DEUX FOIS | [1995/52] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 15.01.1997 | ES | 15.01.1997 | GR | 15.01.1997 | IT | 15.01.1997 | IE | 15.03.1997 | LU | 31.03.1997 | PT | 15.04.1997 | SE | 15.04.1997 | MC | 30.09.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/18] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
ES | 15.01.1997 | ||
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
IE | 15.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
PT | 15.04.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
MC | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2003/17] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
ES | 15.01.1997 | ||
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
IE | 15.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
PT | 15.04.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
MC | 01.10.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
ES | 15.01.1997 | ||
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
IE | 15.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
PT | 15.04.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
MC | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2001/01] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
IE | 15.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
PT | 15.04.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
MC | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
PT | 15.04.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
MC | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
PT | 15.04.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
MC | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
PT | 15.04.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
MC | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | PT | 15.04.1997 | |
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
MC | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | PT | 15.04.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2332751 (POWELL GEORGE E) [X] 1,4,7,11 * page 2, column 1, line 3 - page 3, column 1, line 17; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US3570752 (SCZESNIAK ROBERT E) [A] 1-9* column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US4089419 (YALE ROBERT S) [X] 1,4,7,11 * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3,5,6; | [XA]US4210250 (YALE ROBERT S [US]) [X] 1,4,7,11 * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 37; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,3,5,6 |