EP0686323 - ONE-BIT ANALOG-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTERS AND DIGITAL-TO-ANALOG CONVERTERS USING AN ADAPTIVE FILTER HAVING TWO REGIMES OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOLBY LABORATORIES LICENSING CORPORATION 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94103-4813 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states DOLBY LABORATORIES LICENSING CORPORATION 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco California 94103-4813 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNDRY, Kenneth, James 1656 Sanchez Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 94909820.6 | 14.02.1994 | [1995/50] | WO1994US02103 | Priority number, date | US19930017856 | 16.02.1993 Original published format: US 17856 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9419872 | Date: | 01.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686323 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686323 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03M3/02 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
H03M3/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/50] | Title | German: | EIN-BIT ANALOG/DIGITAL-WANDLER UND DIGITAL/ANALOG-WANDLER MIT EINEM ADAPTIVEN FILTER MIT ZWEI BETRIEBSARTEN | [1997/17] | English: | ONE-BIT ANALOG-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTERS AND DIGITAL-TO-ANALOG CONVERTERS USING AN ADAPTIVE FILTER HAVING TWO REGIMES OF OPERATION | [1995/50] | French: | CONVERTISSEURS ANALOGIQUES-NUMERIQUES ET CONVERTISSEURS NUMERIQUES-ANALOGIQUES A UN BIT UTILISANT UN FILTRE ADAPTATIF A DEUX REGIMES DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [1995/50] |
Former [1995/50] | EIN-BIT ANALOG/DIGITALWANDLER UND DIGITAL/ANALOGWANDLER MIT EINEM ADAPTIVEN FILTER MIT ZWEI BETRIEBSARTEN | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 26.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 24.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2134357 (DBX); | [A] - Ishikawa T et al, "One-bit A/D D/A convert- ers IC for audio delay", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, NOV. 1989, USA, 35, 4, 767 - 774, ISSN 0098-3063, XP000087095 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.106894 | Examination | - U.TIETZE and Ch.SCHENK, "Halbleiter-Schaltungstechnik", 1983, Springer Verlag, Berlin, Heidelberg, New York, Tokyo; pages 398-401 |