EP0643592 - PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/12] | PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SYSTEM AND METHOD EMPLOYING PUMPING CASSETTE | ||
[1998/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEKA PRODUCTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 340 Commercial Street Manchester, NH 03101 / US | [1995/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMEN, Dean 44 Gage Road Bedford, NH 03110 / US | 02 /
SPENCER, Geoffrey, P. 70 Eastmeadow Way Manchester, NH 03109 / US | 03 /
VINCENT, Douglas, E. 287-1 Canal Street Manchester, NH 03101 / US | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | MacGregor, Gordon ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94909827.1 | 28.02.1994 | [1995/12] | WO1994US02123 | Priority number, date | US19930027328 | 03.03.1993 Original published format: US 27328 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420155 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643592 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643592 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/28 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
A61M1/28 (EP,US);
A61M1/1524 (EP,US);
A61M1/155 (EP,US);
A61M1/1561 (EP,US);
A61M1/1565 (EP,US);
A61M1/159 (EP,US);
A61M1/281 (EP,US);
A61M1/288 (EP,US);
A61M2205/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR PERITONALDIALYSE | [1998/45] | English: | PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SYSTEM | [1998/45] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIALYSE PERITONEALE | [1998/45] |
Former [1995/12] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PERITONALDIALYSE MIT PUMPENKASSETTE. | ||
Former [1995/12] | PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SYSTEM AND METHOD EMPLOYING PUMPING CASSETTE | ||
Former [1995/12] | SYSTEME DE DIALYSE PERITONEALE ET PROCEDE UTILISANT UNE CASSETTE DE POMPAGE | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/45: (deleted) | EPB 1998/45: (deleted) | EPB 1998/45: (deleted) | EPB 1997/50: Teilanmeldung 97202949.0 eingereicht am 26/09/97 | EPB 1997/50: Divisional application 97202949.0 filed on 26/09/97 | EPB 1997/50: Demande divisionnaire 97202949.0 déposée le 26/09/97 | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97202949.0 / EP0815882 | EP97202966.4 / EP0815883 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2371931 (ABG SEMCA [FR]) [A] 32-67 * page 2, line 23 - page 4, line 29; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0157024 (SIS TER SPA [IT]) [A] 32-67 * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 21; figure - *; | [A]US4586920 (PEABODY ALAN M [US]) [A] 32-67* column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 31; figure 2 *; | [X]US5141493 (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al) [X] 32,34-36,40,42-47,49,50,52,53,55,56 * column 7, line 24 - line 41; figure - * | Examination | US5098262 |