EP0801550 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING AN IMPROVED LEG CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Jiro, Kanebo Ashiya Urban Plaza 546 1-1-58, Fukae-minami-cho Higashinada-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 658 / JP | 02 /
HIUKE, Takashi 2-15-5, Fujisakahigashi-machi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | 03 /
SHIKATA, Hiroaki 6-6-613-1321, Koyocho-naka, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658 / JP | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 94910131.5 | 23.02.1994 | [1997/43] | WO1994US01767 | Priority number, date | JP19930035768 | 24.02.1993 Original published format: JP 3576893 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9418927 | Date: | 01.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801550 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.09.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
A61F13/4942 (EP);
A61F13/49012 (EP);
A61F13/49015 (EP);
A61F13/49017 (EP);
A61F13/49413 (EP);
A61F13/496 (EP);
A61F2013/49031 (EP);
A61F2013/49044 (EP);
A61F2013/49049 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/43] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTEM BEINANSCHLUSS | [1997/43] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING AN IMPROVED LEG CLOSURE | [1997/43] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT A FERMETURE AMELIOREE AU NIVEAU DES JAMBES | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1995 | Search fee paid | 09.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 09.10.1995 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.10.1995 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | 31.10.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.10.1995 | M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1995 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   18.04.2001 | 28.02.2002 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2680316 (PEAUDOUCE [FR]) [X] 1-4* page 8, line 19 - page 10, line 1; figures 7,11 * | International search | [Y]US4205679 (BROOKS RALPH H JR [US], et al); | [X]JPH03101935 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [YP]US5246432 (SUZUKI MIGAKU [JP], et al) |