EP0686150 - Process for the preparation of C-nucleosides and C-nucleoside analogues, new C-nucleosides and C-nucleoside analogues and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/50] | NUCLEOSIDES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS THERAPEUTIC AGENTS AND AS BUILDING BLOCKS OF SYNTHETIC OLIGONUCLEOTIDES | ||
[1998/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 D-13125 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN Robert-Rössle-Str. 10 D-13125 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÄRWOLFF, Dieter Georg-Benjamin-Strasse 37 D-13125 Berlin / DE | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Baumbach, Friedrich Patentanwalt Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Baumbach, Friedrich Biotez Berlin/Buch Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 D-13125 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 94910321.2 | 24.02.1994 | [1995/50] | WO1994DE00205 | Priority number, date | DE19934306859 | 26.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4306859 | DE19934320570 | 15.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4320570 | [1995/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9419327 | Date: | 01.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686150 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686150 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/02, C07D405/04, C07H21/00, C07H19/06, C07H19/10, C07F9/6506, A61K31/70 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
C07H19/06 (EP);
C07F9/6512 (EP);
C07H19/10 (EP);
C07H21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von C-Nukleosiden und C-Nukleosid-Analoga, neue C-Nukleoside und C-Nukleosid-Analoga, sowie ihre Verwendung | [1998/21] | English: | Process for the preparation of C-nucleosides and C-nucleoside analogues, new C-nucleosides and C-nucleoside analogues and their use | [1998/21] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation des C-nucléosides et des analogues, nouveaux C-nucléosides et des analogues et leur utilisation | [1998/21] |
Former [1995/50] | NUKLEOSIDE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS THERAPEUTIKUM UND ALS BAUSTEIN FÜR SYNTHETISCHE OLIGONUKLEOTIDE | ||
Former [1995/50] | NUCLEOSIDES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS THERAPEUTIC AGENTS AND AS BUILDING BLOCKS OF SYNTHETIC OLIGONUCLEOTIDES | ||
Former [1995/50] | NUCLEOSIDES, LEUR PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES ET COMME ELEMENTS CONSTITUTIFS POUR OLIGONUCLEOTIDES SYNTHETIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 19.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.05.1998 | FR | 20.05.1998 | GB | 20.05.1998 | IT | 20.05.1998 | NL | 20.05.1998 | DK | 20.08.1998 | PT | 20.08.1998 | SE | 20.08.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/45] | ES | 20.05.1998 | |
GB | 20.05.1998 | ||
IT | 20.05.1998 | ||
NL | 20.05.1998 | ||
DK | 20.08.1998 | ||
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
SE | 20.08.1998 | ||
FR | 16.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 20.05.1998 | |
GB | 20.05.1998 | ||
IT | 20.05.1998 | ||
NL | 20.05.1998 | ||
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
SE | 20.08.1998 | ||
FR | 16.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 20.05.1998 | |
GB | 20.05.1998 | ||
IT | 20.05.1998 | ||
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
SE | 20.08.1998 | ||
FR | 16.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 20.05.1998 | |
IT | 20.05.1998 | ||
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
SE | 20.08.1998 | ||
FR | 16.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | GB | 20.05.1998 | |
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
SE | 20.08.1998 | ||
FR | 16.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/25] | GB | 20.05.1998 | |
SE | 20.08.1998 | ||
FR | 16.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | SE | 20.08.1998 | |
FR | 16.10.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | SE | 20.08.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0103464 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 12; figure II * * page 35, line 19 ** page 62; figure IV; claim 6 *; | [A]EP0398231 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [A] 1,13-15 * the whole document * | [X] - J.A.SECRIST III, "Homo-C-nucleosides. The Synthesis of Certain 6-Substituted 4-Pyrimidinones", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (19780707), vol. 43, no. 14, pages 2925 - 2927 [X] 1 * page 2925, column 2; examples 4a-4e * | [X] - T.L.CUPPS ET AL., "Use of Allyltrimethylsilane in the Formation of Potential C-Nucleoside Precursors.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (19821217), vol. 47, no. 26, pages 5115 - 5120 [X] 1 * page 5116, column 2; example 10 * | [X] - T.L.CUPPS ET AL., "A Novel Three-Step Synthesis of a Pyrrolo(3,2-d)pyrimidine C-Nucleoside.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (19860404), vol. 51, no. 7, pages 1058 - 1064 [X] 1 * page 1061; examples 16,22,23 * | [X] - G.RENZ ET AL., "Synthesen von 2,4-substituierten Homo-C-pyrimidin-nucleosiden.", LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, WEINHEIM DE, (19860612), no. 6, pages 957 - 966 [X] 1 * page 958; example 3 * * page 959; examples 10,12 * | [X] - N.KATAGIRI ET AL., "Synthesis of Homo-C-Nucleosides using Pyrimidinylmethylenephosphoranes.", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, LETCHWORTH GB, (1983), pages 201 - 209 [X] 1 * page 205, column 1; examples 22-32 * | [A] - W.O.FOYE ET AL., "Pyridinium- and Quinolinium-2-dithioecetic Acid Zwitterions: Antiradiation an Anticancer Activities.", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1978), vol. 67, no. 7, pages 962 - 964 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - J.HUNG ET AL., "Fluoride- Assisted Nucleophilic Substitution of 6-Alkyl-5-bromouracils with Nitrogen-containing Heterocycles.", SYNTHESIS., STUTTGART DE, (198501), no. 1, pages 80 - 81 [X] 1 | Examination | - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY. Bd. 43, Nr. 14 , 7. Juli 1978 EASTON US Seiten 2925 - 2927 J.A.SECRIST III 'Homo-C-nucleosides. The Synthesis of Certain 6- | - Substituted 4-Pyrimidinones' |