EP0689747 - BIT RATE RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELSA Aktiengesellschaft Sonnenweg 11 52070 Aachen / DE | [1998/10] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states Elsa GmbH Sonnenweg 11 D-52070 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOENZEN, Ralf Am Eselsweg 12 D-52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Kohlmann, Kai Donatusstrasse 1 52078 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Kohlmann, Kai Wallstrasse 46 52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94910322.0 | 08.03.1994 | [1996/01] | WO1994DE00237 | Priority number, date | DE19934308418 | 17.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4308418 | [1996/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9422252 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689747 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0689747 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
H04L25/0262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | BITRATENERKENNUNG | [1996/01] | English: | BIT RATE RECOGNITION | [1996/01] | French: | RECONNAISSANCE DE DEBIT BINAIRE | [1996/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.07.1998 | GB | 22.07.1998 | IT | 22.07.1998 | NL | 22.07.1998 | SE | 22.10.1998 | AT | 08.03.1999 | BE | 31.03.1999 | CH | 31.03.1999 | LI | 31.03.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 22.07.1998 | |
GB | 22.07.1998 | ||
NL | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
AT | 08.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GB | 22.07.1998 | |
NL | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
AT | 08.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | GB | 22.07.1998 | |
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
AT | 08.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | GB | 22.07.1998 | |
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | GB | 22.07.1998 | |
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/29] | GB | 22.07.1998 | |
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/25] | GB | 22.07.1998 | |
FR | 18.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 18.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5072407 (GUTZ STEVEN J [CA], et al) [X] 1-8 * column A; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 39 - line 60 *; | [XP]US5206888 (HIRAGUCHI MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [XP] 1-8 * column A; figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 54 - line 59 ** column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 20 * | by applicant | JPS57103546 | US5072407 |