EP0644194 - PYRIDOTHIAZINE ACETIC ACID COMPOUNDS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/12] | PYRIDOTHIAZINEACETIC ACID COMPOUND, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2000/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WELFIDE CORPORATION 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi / JP | For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Welfide Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi / JP | ||
For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | |||
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | |||
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states THE GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | ||
For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSONO, Hiroshi 305, Furatto-Fiirudo, 2-9-2, Hirata Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 02 /
AOTSUKA, Tomoji M202, Azeria, 3-29, Futaba-cho Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Yoshiyuki 105, Haitsu-Toro, 61-5, Nakadahoncho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 422 / JP | 04 /
MATSUI, Tetsuo 403, Etowaru-Kasuga, 2-35-2, Kasuga Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 05 /
ISHIKAWA, Hiromichi, 966, Gurandohaitsu-Uozaki 14-10, Uozakikitamachi 4-chome Higashinada-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658 / JP | [2001/17] |
Former [1995/12] | 01 /
HOSONO, Hiroshi 305, Furatto-Fiirudo, 2-9-2, Hirata Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | ||
02 /
AOTSUKA, Tomoji M202, Azeria, 3-29, Futaba-cho Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMURA, Yoshiyuki 105, Haitsu-Toro, 61-5, Nakadahoncho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 422 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUI, Tetsuo 403, Etowaru-Kasuga, 2-35-2, Kasuga Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | |||
05 /
ISHIKAWA, Hiromichi, 966, Gurandohaitsu-Uozaki 14-10, Uozakikitamachi 4-chome Higashinada-ku, Kobe-ishi, Hyogo 658 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/12] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94910559.7 | 29.03.1994 | [1995/12] | WO1994JP00508 | Priority number, date | JP19930091935 | 29.03.1993 Original published format: JP 9193593 | [1995/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9422875 | Date: | 13.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644194 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/04, A61K31/54, // (C07D513/04, 279:00, 221:00) | [1995/29] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,KR);
A61K31/54 (KR);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1995/12] | C07D513/04, A61K31/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | PYRIDOTHIAZINESSIGSÄURE-DERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG | [1995/12] | English: | PYRIDOTHIAZINE ACETIC ACID COMPOUNDS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF | [2000/42] | French: | COMPOSES A BASE D'ACIDE PYRIDOTHIAZINEACETIQUE, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION | [2000/42] |
Former [1995/12] | PYRIDOTHIAZINEACETIC ACID COMPOUND, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [1995/12] | COMPOSE A BASE D'ACIDE PYRIDOTHIAZINEACETIQUE, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1994 | Translation filed | 28.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 28.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 16.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/02] | 02.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0162776 (CARPIBEM [FR]) [Y] 1,6,8 * page 1; claims 1,15 *; | [Y]EP0492667 (SAPPORO BREWERIES [JP]) [Y] 1,6,8 * claims 1,9-11 * | International search | [A]JPH03118380 (EISAI CO LTD) | by applicant | JPS638387 | JPS5740478 | - J.H. KINOSHITA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1968), vol. 158, page 472 | - RICHARD POULSON ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1983), vol. 32, page 1495 | - D. DVORNIK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1973), vol. 182, page 1145 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 103, 6291N, 568 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 34, pages 108 - 122 | - S. HAYMAN ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1965), vol. 240, pages 877 - 882 | - H.Y. BERGMEYER ET AL., METHODS OF ENZYMATIC ANALYSIS, (1974), vol. 3, pages 1323 - 1330 |