EP0689492 - SYSTEM FOR CLEANING MOLDING EQUIPMENT USING A LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERNAY LABORATORIES, INC. 120 East South College Street, P.O. Box 310 Yellow Springs, OH 45387-0310 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states VERNAY LABORATORIES, INC. 120 East South College Street, P.O. Box 310 Yellow Springs, OH 45387-0310 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGY, Robert, E. 2521 Indian Wells Trail Xenia, OH 45385 / US | 02 /
SHELTON, Timothy, F. 648 Doral Drive Xenia, OH 45385 / US | 03 /
MILAM, Jeffrey, L. 2585 Celia Drive Beavercreek, OH 45434 / US | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94910942.5 | 15.03.1994 | [1996/01] | WO1994US02781 | Priority number, date | US19930033280 | 16.03.1993 Original published format: US 33280 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9421418 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689492 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0689492 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00, B08B7/00 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
B22D17/2007 (EP,US);
B08B7/0042 (EP,US);
B22D45/00 (EP,US);
B23K26/035 (EP,US);
B29C33/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/01] | B23K26/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM REINIGEN EINER GIESSVORRICHTUNG MITTELS EINES LASERS | [1996/01] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CLEANING MOLDING EQUIPMENT USING A LASER | [1996/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE NETTOYAGE D'EQUIPEMENT DE MOULAGE METTANT EN OEUVRE UN LASER | [1998/24] |
Former [1996/01] | SYSTEME DE NETTOYAGE D'EQUIPEMENT DE MOULAGE METTANT EN UVRE UN LASER | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1995 | Search fee paid | 11.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 09.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 04.04.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.1998 | BE | 10.06.1998 | CH | 10.06.1998 | GR | 10.06.1998 | LI | 10.06.1998 | NL | 10.06.1998 | DK | 10.09.1998 | SE | 10.09.1998 | PT | 15.09.1998 | [2015/21] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
CH | 10.06.1998 | ||
GR | 10.06.1998 | ||
LI | 10.06.1998 | ||
NL | 10.06.1998 | ||
DK | 10.09.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
PT | 15.09.1998 | ||
FR | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
CH | 10.06.1998 | ||
GR | 10.06.1998 | ||
LI | 10.06.1998 | ||
NL | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
PT | 15.09.1998 | ||
FR | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
CH | 10.06.1998 | ||
GR | 10.06.1998 | ||
LI | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
PT | 15.09.1998 | ||
FR | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/17] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
CH | 10.06.1998 | ||
LI | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
PT | 15.09.1998 | ||
FR | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
PT | 15.09.1998 | ||
FR | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
BE | 10.06.1998 | ||
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
FR | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 10.06.1998 | |
SE | 10.09.1998 | ||
FR | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | SE | 10.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4534921 (FIERKENS RICHARDUS H J [NL], et al); | [A]US4927226 (ORTIZ JR ANGEL L [US]); | [XA]EP0380387 (ARDT [FR]) | International search | [A]US4720621 (LANGEN ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US5072092 (RICHTER KLAUS [DE], et al); | [A]USRE33777E ; | [A]US5111023 (HORIBE KINYA [JP], et al) |