EP0690740 - COMPRESSIBLE DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE ENERGIZED SEALS FOR FILTER ELEMENTS AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden Connecticut 06450 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden Connecticut 06450 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PULEK, John, L. 1197C Ella Grasso Boulevard New Haven, CT 06511 / US | 02 /
BARNES, Robert, G. 631 Brownstone Ridge Meriden, CT 06450 / US | 03 /
OSTREICHER, Eugene, A. 9 Reservation Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 94910947.4 | 15.03.1994 | [1996/02] | WO1994US02793 | Priority number, date | US19930034730 | 22.03.1993 Original published format: US 34730 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9421350 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690740 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690740 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D27/08, B01D29/33 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
B01D29/333 (EP,US);
B01D27/08 (KR);
B01D2201/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/02] | B01D27/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/02] | Title | German: | KOMPRIMIERBARE, DURCH DRUCKUNTERSCHIEDE AKTIVIERTE DICHTUNGEN FÜR FILTERELEMENTE UND ÄHNLICHE | [1999/02] | English: | COMPRESSIBLE DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE ENERGIZED SEALS FOR FILTER ELEMENTS AND THE LIKE | [1996/02] | French: | JOINTS D'ETANCHEITE COMPRESSIBLES POUR DES ELEMENTS DE FILTRE ET SIMILAIRE, QUI SONT ACTIVES PAR UN DIFFERENTIEL DE PRESSION | [1996/02] |
Former [1996/02] | KOMPRIMIERBARE, DURCH DRUCKUNTERSCHIEDE AKTIVIERTE DICHTUNGENFÜR FILTERELEMENTE UND ÄHNLICHE | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.1995 | Search fee paid | 18.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR1396547 (PREC MECANIQUE LABINAL) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,13,14 * figures 1-7 * [A] 3-5,11,12; | [XA]GB1253354 (TECALEMIT ENGINEERING) [X] 1,2,8,9 * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,11; | [A]US4052317 (PALNIK KARL) [A] 1,7,8,14 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]GB895133 (FRAM CORP) [A] 1,8 * figures 4,6 * | International search | [YP]US5250179 (SPEARMAN MICHAEL R [US]); | [YP]US5238717 (BOYLAN MICHAEL A [US]); | [YP]US5290442 (CLACK ROBERT A [US]) |