EP0644980 - CORNER AREA OF A SEALING FRAME FOR A TUNNEL TUBBING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DÄTWYLER AG Schweizerische Kabel- Gummi- und Kunststoffwerke Gotthardstrasse 31 CH-6460 Altdorf-Uri / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states DÄTWYLER AG Schweizerische Kabel- Gummi- und Kunststoffwerke Gotthardstrasse 31 CH-6460 Altdorf-Uri / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERWEGH, Norbert Breitacherli 16 CH-6467 Schattdorf / CH | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Siebert, Rolf PATENTANWALTSBUREAU R.A. MASPOLI Witikon - Zentrum Postfach 191 8053 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Siebert, Rolf, Dipl.-Masch.Ing.ETH p.A. PATENTANWALTSBUREAU R.A. MASPOLI Postfach 191 CH-8053 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 94911044.9 | 11.04.1994 | [1995/13] | WO1994CH00072 | Priority number, date | CH19930001166 | 16.04.1993 Original published format: CH 116693 | [1995/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424417 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644980 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644980 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/38 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
E21D11/385 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/13] | Title | German: | ECKBEREICH EINES DICHTUNGSRAHMENS FÜR EINEN TUNNELTÜBBING | [1995/13] | English: | CORNER AREA OF A SEALING FRAME FOR A TUNNEL TUBBING | [1995/13] | French: | COIN DE CADRE D'ETANCHEITE POUR PANNEAUX DE CUVELAGE DE TUNNELS | [1995/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2017194 (DAETWYLER AG) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]EP0414617 (JOINT FRANCAIS [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * |