EP0644999 - FILL-LEVEL INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENDRESS + HAUSER GMBH + CO. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. Hauptstrasse 1 D-79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWALD, Rolf Obere Holzmatt 13 D-79650 Schopfheim / DE | 02 /
KLÖFER, Peter Marktstrasse 8/1 D-79585 Steinen / DE | 03 /
ECKERT, Manfred Stuhlstrasse 12 D-79674 Todtnau / DE | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Morstadt, Volker Endress + Hauser Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 2222 79574 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Morstadt, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Endress + Hauser Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 2222 79574 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 94911076.1 | 24.03.1994 | [1995/13] | WO1994DE00339 | Priority number, date | DE19934311963 | 10.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4311963 | [1995/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424524 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644999 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644999 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/28, B06B1/06 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
B06B1/0674 (EP,US);
G01F23/2968 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | FÜLLSTANDSMESSGERÄT | [1995/13] | English: | FILL-LEVEL INDICATOR | [1995/13] | French: | INDICATEUR DE NIVEAU | [1995/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 08.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE9209977U (VEGA GRIESHABER) [X] 1 * figures 5,6 * * page 12, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph L *; | [A]EP0340624 (HONTZSCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 38 - line 52 * * column 5, line 1 - line 7; figure . *; | [A]DE853355 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * page 2, line 49 - line 58; figure 1 * |