EP0690742 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING OF HOT GAS AND EXTRACTION OF ENERGY THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRANSTRAND, Lennart Rödabergsgatan 7 S-113 33 Stockholm / SE | [1996/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Larsson, Karin Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Larsson, Karin H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94911343.5 | 17.03.1994 | [1996/02] | WO1994SE00240 | Priority number, date | SE19930000962 | 23.03.1993 Original published format: SE 9300962 | [1996/02] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9421356 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690742 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690742 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34, F23J15/00 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
B01D53/50 (EP);
B01D53/002 (EP);
F23J15/06 (EP);
F25B29/003 (EP);
F25B5/04 (EP);
Y02E20/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1996/02] | Title | German: | METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON HEISSEM GAS UND GEWINNUNG VON ENERGIE AUS DEMSELBEN | [1996/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING OF HOT GAS AND EXTRACTION OF ENERGY THEREFROM | [1996/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION D'EPURATION D'UN GAZ CHAUD ET DE RECUPERATION D'ENERGIE DANS CE PROCESSUS | [1996/02] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.1995 | Translation filed | 17.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 11.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.1997 | CH | 12.11.1997 | FR | 12.11.1997 | LI | 12.11.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/52] | AT | 12.11.1997 | |
CH | 12.11.1997 | ||
LI | 12.11.1997 | ||
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 12.11.1997 | |
CH | 17.02.1998 | ||
LI | 17.02.1998 | ||
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | AT | 12.11.1997 | |
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 12.11.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE440608 (LINDAHL ERIK, et al) |