EP0688348 - MODIFIED FILLER MATERIAL FOR ALKALINE PAPER AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF IN ALKALINE PAPER MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINERALS TECHNOLOGIES INC. The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue New York, New York 10174 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states MINERALS TECHNOLOGIES INC. The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue New York, New York 10174 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILL, Robert, A. 430 Barclay Drive Bethlehem, PA 18017 / US | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Bawden, Peter Charles, et al Bawden & Associates Rothamsted Enterprises Russell Building West Common Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Bawden, Peter Charles, et al Bawden & Associates, 66a High Street Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2SP / GB | ||
Former [1995/52] | Horner, Martin Grenville Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 94911533.1 | 11.03.1994 | [1995/52] | WO1994US02586 | Priority number, date | US19930030992 | 12.03.1993 Original published format: US 30992 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420576 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688348 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688348 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/02, C09C1/36, D21H23/00, C09C3/08, C09C1/42, D21H17/69 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
D21H21/16 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/021 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/3669 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/42 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/08 (EP,US);
D21H17/69 (EP,US);
C01P2004/32 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/52] | C09C1/02, C09C1/36, D21H23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTES FÜLLSTOFFMATERIAL FÜR ALKALISCHES PAPIER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN DER HERSTELLUNG VON ALKALISCHEM PAPIER | [1995/52] | English: | MODIFIED FILLER MATERIAL FOR ALKALINE PAPER AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF IN ALKALINE PAPER MAKING | [1995/52] | French: | CHARGE MODIFIEE POUR PAPIER ALCALIN ET SON UTILISATION DANS LA FABRICATION DU PAPIER ALCALIN | [1995/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1995 | Search fee paid | 11.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03075442.8 / EP1314763 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2006
30.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG 42, Baslerstrasse 4665 Oftringen / CH Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2006
30.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG 42, BASELRSTRASSE CH-4665 OFTRINGEN / CH Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | 02.05.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.10.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.02.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/26] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.06.2005 | GB | 11.03.2006 | SE | 12.03.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | IE | 13.03.2006 | BE | 31.03.2006 | CH | 31.03.2006 | FR | 31.03.2006 | LI | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | NL | 01.10.2006 | DE | 03.10.2006 | PT | 12.12.2006 | IT | 11.03.2007 | DK | 02.04.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/23] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
GB | 11.03.2006 | ||
SE | 12.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
FR | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
DE | 03.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
DK | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
GB | 11.03.2006 | ||
SE | 12.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
FR | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
DE | 03.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
GB | 11.03.2006 | ||
SE | 12.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
DE | 03.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
GB | 11.03.2006 | ||
SE | 12.03.2006 | ||
IE | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
DE | 03.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
SE | 12.03.2006 | ||
IE | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
DE | 03.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
SE | 12.03.2006 | ||
IE | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DE | 03.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
SE | 12.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 22.06.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5865762 ; | SU291875 [ ] (ZELIKIN, M.B. ET AL.); | [X]JPS6069011 ; | [X]JPS60231744 ; | [X]SU1333679 ; | [A]JPS59228098 ; | [X]US4648908 (TAKASUKA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,44,48,55-58 * claims 1,3-6,9,11 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 21, Database accession no. 83-50772k, XP002058957 & JPS5865762 A 19830419 (MIZUSAWA CHEM. IND. CO.) [X] 1,44,58 * abstract * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19710628), vol. 74, no. 26, Database accession no. 143932u, page 118, column left, XP002058956 [X] 1,2,4,44,58 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850816), vol. 9, no. 200, Database accession no. (C - 298), & JP60069011 A 19850419 (MIYOSHI KASEI) [X] 1,2,4-8,38-44,46-48,53-58 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 01, Database accession no. 86-004363, XP002058958 & JPS60231744 A 19851118 (SHIRAISHI CHUO KENKYUSHO) [X] 1-5,7,8,44,48,55-58 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 15, Database accession no. 88-103739, XP002058959 & SU1333679 A 19870830 (BEKKERMAN L.I.) [X] 1,2,4-8,44,48,55-58 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 06, Database accession no. 85-034514, XP002058960 & JPS59228098 A 19841221 (ASAHI GLASS CO.) [A] 1,2,18,58 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5147507 (GILL ROBERT A [US]) | [Y] - ARNSON et al., Ch. 5, "Internal Sizing with Stearic Acid", The Sizing of Paper, 2nd ed., (REYNOLDS, Editor), pp 79-86, Tappi Press, 1989. |