EP0640028 - PRODUCT LENGTH CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.R. Simplot Company 999 Main Street, Suite 300 Boise, ID 83707 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY 999 Main Street, Suite 300 Boise, ID 83707 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAYLE, B., Pike P.O. Box 2438 Twin Falls, ID 83303 / US | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/09] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, et al Ruschke & Partner, Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94911535.6 | 11.03.1994 | [1995/09] | WO1994US02592 | Priority number, date | US19930029560 | 11.03.1993 Original published format: US 29560 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420270 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640028 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640028 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/09, B26D7/06 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
B26D5/00 (EP,US);
B26D5/20 (EP,US);
Y10S83/932 (EP,US);
Y10T83/04 (EP,US);
Y10T83/145 (EP,US);
Y10T83/515 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [1995/09] | Title | German: | LÄNGENKONTROLLSYSTEM EINES PRODUKTES | [1995/09] | English: | PRODUCT LENGTH CONTROL SYSTEM | [1995/09] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DE LA LONGUEUR D'UN PRODUIT | [1995/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 10.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3796146 (LACEY E); | [XY]US5142955 (HALE JAMES C [US]); | [Y]US3738258 (GOODALE R); | [Y]US1102808 (SHOMAN FRED A [US]); | [A]US3732761 (SANDERS H); | [A]US4023605 (HELLSTROM NILS ERIK, et al); | [A]US4576071 (RAYMENT ARTHUR G [US]); | [A]US5163865 (SMITH LARRY J [US]) |