EP0691006 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A RELOCATABLE FILE FORMAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLE COMPUTER, INC. 20525 Mariani Avenue Cupertino California 95014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states APPLE COMPUTER, INC. 20525 Mariani Avenue Cupertino, California 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIDT, Erik, L. 83 N. Second Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
LILLICH, Alan, W. 3 Euclid Avenue Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94911648.7 | 17.03.1994 | [1996/02] | WO1994US02952 | Priority number, date | US19930035750 | 23.03.1993 Original published format: US 35750 | US19940212153 | 14.03.1994 Original published format: US 212153 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9422078 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691006 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691006 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
G06F8/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/02] | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN VERSCHIEBBARES DATEIFORMAT | [1996/02] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A RELOCATABLE FILE FORMAT | [1996/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR FORMAT DE FICHIER READRESSABLE | [1996/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.01.1998 | [1999/42] | Cited in | International search | [XA] - IEEE STD 695-1990: IEEE STANDARD FOR MICROPROCESSOR UNIVERSAL FORMAT FOR OBJECT MODULES,, NEW YORK, US, (199102) [X] 1-3,89 * page 7, column R, lines 24-25 * * page 8, column L, line 44 - column R, line 4 * * page 18, column L, line 44 - column R, line 7 * [A] 16,36,46,99 | [A] - R. BRAGA ET AL.:, "A Portable Linking Loader", SYMPOSIUM ON TRENDS AND APPLICATIONS 1976: MICRO AND MINI SYSTEMS,, GAITHERSBURG, MD, US,, (19760527), pages 124 - 128 [A] 1-3,16,36,46,89,99 * abstract * * page 125, column L, line 5 - page 126, column L, line 34 * * page 127, column L, line 18 - page 128, column R, line 27 * | [A] - LEON PRESSER ET AL.:, "Linkers and Loaders", ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS,, US,, (197209), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 149 - 167 [A] 1-3,16,36,46,89,99 * the whole document * | [XA] - A. KANAI ET AL.:, "The concept and implementation of standard object module format for microprocessors (SYSROF-E)", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1986 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL AND INSTRUMENTATION IECON'86,, MILWAUKEE, WI, US,, (19860929), vol. 2 OF 2, pages 839 - 844 [X] 62,81 * page 841, column L, line 47 - page 844, column L, line 42; figure -; table - * [A] 63-80,82-88,115-118 | [A] - "Inter-linkage function invocation method", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,, NEW YORK, US,, (199209), vol. 35, no. 4B, pages 44 - 49, XP000313847 [A] 62-88,115-118 * the whole document * | [A] - "EXE format for 32-bit personal computer systems", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,, NEW YORK, US,, (199108), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 363 - 365, XP000210617 [A] 62-88,115-118 * the whole document * | [A] - J.R. GARITAGOITIA ET AL.:, "Relocating direct linking loader for MCS-80 microcomputer series", EUROMICRO NEWSLETTER,, AMSTERDAM, NL,, (1977), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 22 - 28 [A] 62-88,115-118 * page 26, column R, line 17 - line 25 * | [X] - R. DUNCAN:, Advanced OS/2 Programming, REDMOND, WASHINGTON, US, MICROSOFT PRESS, (1989) [X] 119-121 * (Appendix D, pages 715 - 736) * * page 722, line 17 - line 18 * * page 725, line 34 - page 726, line 13 * * page 732, line 5 - page 733, line 16 * |