EP0691977 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES WITH AMIDE LINKAGES REPLACING PHOSPHODIESTER LINKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf 75374 Paris Cédex 08 / FR | [1997/12] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states STERLING WINTHROP INC. 90 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATURVEDULA, Prasad, Venkata, Chala 523 Summercroft Drive Exton, PA 19341 / US | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94911659.4 | 21.03.1994 | [1996/03] | WO1994US02994 | Priority number, date | US19930040826 | 31.03.1993 Original published format: US 40826 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9422891 | Date: | 13.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691977 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691977 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00, A61K31/70 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDE MIT AMIDVERKETTUNGEN DIE PHOSPHOESTERVERKETTUNGEN EINSETZEN | [1996/03] | English: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDES WITH AMIDE LINKAGES REPLACING PHOSPHODIESTER LINKAGES | [1996/03] | French: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDES A LIAISONS D'AMIDES REMPLACANT LES LIAISONS DE PHOSPHODIESTERS | [1996/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 11.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.1997 | BE | 26.11.1997 | CH | 26.11.1997 | DK | 26.11.1997 | ES | 26.11.1997 | GR | 26.11.1997 | LI | 26.11.1997 | NL | 26.11.1997 | PT | 26.02.1998 | SE | 26.02.1998 | LU | 21.03.1998 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
CH | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
ES | 26.11.1997 | ||
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
LI | 26.11.1997 | ||
NL | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
CH | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
ES | 26.11.1997 | ||
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
LI | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
CH | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
LI | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
CH | 03.03.1998 | ||
LI | 03.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
BE | 26.11.1997 | ||
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
DK | 26.11.1997 | ||
SE | 26.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 26.11.1997 | |
DK | 26.11.1997 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8605518 (SUMMERTON JAMES, et al) [Y] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]EP0464638 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 37 *; | [XY]WO9220823 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * * page 10, line 4 - line 8 * * example 25 * * page 66, line 10 - line 21 * [Y] 1-12; | [XY]WO9220822 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * [Y] 1-12 |