EP0691986 - NOVEL PROCESSES AND INTERMEDIATE COMPOUNDS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PLATELET CLYCOPROTEIN IIb/IIIa INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lin-Hua 236 Barberry Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | 02 /
MA, Philip 29 Constitution Drive Chadds Ford, PA 19317-9406 / US | 03 /
DEGRADO, William Frank 502 Bancroft Road Moylan, PA 19063-4207 / US | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94911702.2 | 28.03.1994 | [1996/03] | WO1994US03221 | Priority number, date | US19930038434 | 29.03.1993 Original published format: US 38434 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9422909 | Date: | 13.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691986 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691986 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/12, C07K5/10, C07K7/56 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
C07K7/56 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07K14/75 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | PROZESS UND ZWISCHENVERBINDUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BLAETTCHEN GLYCOPROTEIN IIB/IIIA HEMMERN | [1996/03] | English: | NOVEL PROCESSES AND INTERMEDIATE COMPOUNDS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PLATELET CLYCOPROTEIN IIb/IIIa INHIBITORS | [1996/03] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCEDE ET COMPOSES INTERMEDIAIRES SERVANT A LA PREPARATION D'INHIBITEURS DE LA GLYCOPROTEINE PLAQUETTAIRE IIb/IIIa | [1996/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2003/17] | MC | 31.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9002750 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]); | [A]WO9101331 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [PX]WO9307170 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [PX] 9-12* example 4 * |