EP0645480 - FIBER WITH NETWORK STRUCTURE, NONWOVEN FABRIC CONSTITUTED THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE FIBER AND THE FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITIKA LTD. 50, Higashihonmachi, 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states UNITIKA LTD. 50, Higashihonmachi, 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Fumio, Research and Development Center of Unitika Ltd, 23, Uji Kozakura Uji-shi, Kyoto 611 / JP | 02 /
MURASE, Shigemitsu, Research & Development Center of Unitika Ltd., 23, Uji Kozakura Uji-shi, Kyoto 611 / JP | 03 /
NAGAOKA, Koichi, Research and Development Center of Unitika Ltd, 23, Uji Kozakura Uji-shi, Kyoto 611 / JP | 04 /
NISHIMURA, Hiroshi, Research & Development Center of Unitika Ltd., 23, Uji Kozakura Uji-shi, Kyoto 611 / JP | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Avenue de Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [1995/13] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT-CABINET CHEREAU, 9, Rue du Valais CH-1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 94912067.9 | 06.04.1994 | [1995/13] | WO1994JP00581 | Priority number, date | JP19930081584 | 08.04.1993 Original published format: JP 8158493 | JP19930081585 | 08.04.1993 Original published format: JP 8158593 | JP19930104870 | 06.05.1993 Original published format: JP 10487093 | [1995/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424347 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0645480 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645480 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.10.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/11, D04H1/42 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
D04H1/435 (EP);
D04H1/43838 (EP,US);
D01F8/06 (EP);
D01F8/14 (EP);
D04H1/4291 (EP);
D04H1/724 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1995/13] | D01F8/06, D01F8/14, D01F6/04, D01F6/62, D04H3/00, D04H3/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU [1995/13] | Title | German: | FASER MIT NETZWERKSTRUKTUR, DARAUS GEBILDETER VLIESSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER FASER UND DES VLIESSTOFFES | [1995/13] | English: | FIBER WITH NETWORK STRUCTURE, NONWOVEN FABRIC CONSTITUTED THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE FIBER AND THE FABRIC | [1995/13] | French: | FIBRE A STRUCTURE RETICULEE, NON-TISSE CONSTITUE DE TELLES FIBRES, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LA FIBRE ET DU NON-TISSE | [1995/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1994 | Translation filed | 17.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 17.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 06.04.2003 | [2004/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2246661 (ANIC SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [X]EP0093021 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 4 * * page 14, line 2; claim - *; | [A]US4443513 (MEITNER GARY H [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10,16* example 4; claim - * | International search | [A]JPS5285513 (AKZO NV); | [A]JPS53109536 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [Y]JPS5516906 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPS61160476 (KURARAY CO); | [A]JPH01132819 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPH02139416 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPH02221448 (CHISSO CORP); | [Y]JPH0369613 (KURARAY CO) |