EP0688263 - EXTRUSION LAMINATE OF INCREMENTALLY STRETCHED NONWOVEN FIBROUS WEB AND THERMOPLASTIC FILM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLOPAY PLASTIC PRODUCTS COMPANY, INC. Suite 1600, 312 Walnut Street Cincinnati, OH 45202-4036 / US | [1995/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Pai-Chuan 11053 Huntwicke Place Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94912193.3 | 09.03.1994 | [1995/52] | WO1994US02491 | Priority number, date | US19930032355 | 12.03.1993 Original published format: US 32355 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420298 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688263 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688263 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, D06N3/04 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B38/0012 (EP,US);
D06N3/04 (KR);
D06N3/045 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (US);
B32B2307/7163 (US);
Y10T156/1002 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/263 (EP,US);
Y10T428/264 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | EXTRUSIONSLAMINAT AUS EINER UNGLEICHMÄSSIG VERSTRECKTEN FASERBAHN UND EINEM THERMOPLASTISCHEN FILTER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1995/52] | English: | EXTRUSION LAMINATE OF INCREMENTALLY STRETCHED NONWOVEN FIBROUS WEB AND THERMOPLASTIC FILM AND METHOD | [1995/52] | French: | STRATIFIE OBTENU PAR EXTRUSION COMPOSE DE TISSU FIBREUX NON TISSE ETIRE PROGRESSIVEMENT ET D'UN FILM THERMOPLASTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1995/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 08.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US4153664 (SABEE REINHARDT N) [DY] 1-5,10-14 * see abstract; column 12, line 67 - column 13, line 10 *; | [A]EP0006263 (BUCKEYE CELLULOSE CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,9,16* claims 1-4 *; | [Y]US4673615 (MURPHY RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,10-14 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 2; figures 1,2 * |