EP0694048 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A FLEXIBLE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1996/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUYGENS, Eric Propsper Poulletlaan 3 B-3001 Heverlee / BE | 02 /
ELING, Berend Streeklaan 24 B-3060 Bertem / BE | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H. Intellectual Property Department Huntsman Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H. Intellectual Property Department ICI Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 B-3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 94912523.1 | 23.03.1994 | [1996/05] | WO1994EP00928 | Priority number, date | GB19930007556 | 13.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9307556 | GB19940001339 | 25.01.1994 Original published format: GB 9401339 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424184 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694048 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694048 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/22, C08G18/63, C08G18/40, C07C59/60, C08G65/32, // (C08G18/48, 101:00) | [1996/05] | CPC: |
C07C69/60 (EP);
C07C59/60 (EP);
C08G18/225 (EP);
C08G18/288 (EP);
C08G18/409 (EP);
C08G18/4804 (EP);
C08G18/4837 (EP);
C08G18/50 (EP);
C08G18/632 (EP);
C08G18/6795 (EP);
C08G65/3324 (EP);
C08G65/33358 (EP);
C08G65/338 (EP);
C08G2110/0008 (EP);
C08G2110/0016 (EP);
C08G2110/005 (EP);
C08G2110/0058 (EP);
C08G2110/0083 (EP);
C08G2350/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WEICHSCHAUMSTOFFS | [1996/05] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A FLEXIBLE FOAM | [1996/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE MOUSSE FLEXIBLE | [1996/05] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/47: Teilanmeldung 96115320.2 eingereicht am 23/09/96 | EPB 1996/47: Divisional application 96115320.2 filed on 23/09/96 | EPB 1996/47: Demande divisionnaire 96115320.2 déposée le 23/09/96 | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 06.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96115320.2 / EP0751114 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0485953 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-5,7 * claims 1-7 * * page 3, line 5 - line 50 * * page 5, line 8 - line 19 *; | [Y]US4098732 (YUKUTA TOSHIO, et al) [Y] 1-5,7 * claims 1,4,8,10,12,16 * * column 4, line 35 - line 53 * * column 5, line 1 - line 43 *; | [A]US4393015 (KANEDA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,6 * * column 4, line 36 - line 41 *; | [A]EP0398304 (MONTEDIPE SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * claims 1,4,6-8 * * page 3, line 1 - line 20 *; | [A]EP0022617 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]GB2025439 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD) [A] 1 * claims 1-6 * * page 2, line 45 - line 61 *; | [A]US4365025 (MURCH ROBERT M, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,10,17,21 *; | [DX]GB2064567 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [DX] 8 * claims 1-3 * * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 3 * |